Philips North America LLC et al v. Summit Imaging Inc et al
Plaintiff: Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips North America LLC, Koninklijke Philips NV and Philips India, LTD.
Defendant: Lawrence R Nguyen, Does 1-10, Summit Imaging Inc. and Summit Imaging Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01745
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re: parties' #22 Stipulated Motion. Plaintiffs to file their First Amended Complaint on or before 12/20/2019. Defendants' deadline to respond to First Amended Complaint is extended to 1/10/2020. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/16/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/31/2020, Joint Status Report due by 2/7/2020. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
December 20, 2019 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Koninklijke Philips N.V. for Philips India, LTD.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Philips India, LTD. (Willey, Stephen)
December 20, 2019 Filing 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by Philips North America LLC, Koninklijke Philips NV, Philips India, LTD..(Willey, Stephen)
December 19, 2019 Filing 22 Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order Consenting to Plaintiffs' Filing a First Amended Complaint, Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to First Amended Complaint, and Extending Initial Scheduling Dates, filed by Plaintiffs Koninklijke Philips NV, Philips North America LLC. Noting Date 12/19/2019, (Willey, Stephen)
December 10, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeffrey E. Danley on behalf of Defendants Lawrence R Nguyen, Summit Imaging Inc. (Danley, Jeffrey)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 1/9/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 12/19/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/2/2020. (AD)
November 22, 2019 Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk William M McCool. Case reassigned to Judge James L. Robart for all further proceedings. Hon. Michelle L. Peterson no longer assigned to case. (KMP)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson, re #17 Stipulation filed by parties. Defendants answer due 12/20/2019. (KMP)
November 15, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint by parties (Levy, Marc)
November 14, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 11/21/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (TF)
November 13, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Thomas Shewmake on behalf of Defendants Lawrence R Nguyen, Summit Imaging Inc. (Shewmake, Thomas)
November 13, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Marc C Levy on behalf of Defendants Lawrence R Nguyen, Summit Imaging Inc. (Levy, Marc)
November 13, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney E Russell Tarleton on behalf of Defendants Lawrence R Nguyen, Summit Imaging Inc. (Tarleton, E)
October 30, 2019 Filing 12 Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants Summit Imaging Inc and Lawrence R Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(GT)
October 30, 2019 Hon. Michelle L. Peterson added. (GT)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Gerard M. Donovan for Plaintiffs Koninklijke Philips NV and for Philips North America LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Richard A Graham for Plaintiffs Koninklijke Philips NV and for Philips North America LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kirsten R Rydstrom for Plaintiffs Koninklijke Philips NV and for Philips North America LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Plaintiffs Carla M Wirtschafter for Koninklijke Philips NV and for Philips North America LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Gerard M. Donovan FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips North America LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5986753 (Willey, Stephen)
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Richard A. Graham FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips North America LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5986749 (Willey, Stephen)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kirsten R. Rydstrom FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips North America LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5986744 (Willey, Stephen)
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Carla M. Wirtschafter FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips North America LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5986734 (Willey, Stephen)
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V. (Willey, Stephen)
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Koninklijke Philips N.V., Other Affiliate Philips Holding USA Inc. for Philips North America LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Philips North America LLC (Willey, Stephen)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5986695) Attorney Stephen C Willey added to party Koninklijke Philips N.V.(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen C Willey added to party Philips North America LLC(pty:pla), filed by Philips North America LLC, Koninklijke Philips N.V.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Summit Imaging Inc., #3 Summons to Lawrence R. Nguyen)(Willey, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philips North America LLC et al v. Summit Imaging Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence R Nguyen
Represented By: Thomas Shewmake
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Danley
Represented By: Marc C Levy
Represented By: E Russell Tarleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summit Imaging Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summit Imaging Inc
Represented By: Thomas Shewmake
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Danley
Represented By: Marc C Levy
Represented By: E Russell Tarleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Koninklijke Philips N.V.
Represented By: Stephen C Willey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philips North America LLC
Represented By: Stephen C Willey
Represented By: Richard A Graham
Represented By: Kirsten R Rydstrom
Represented By: Gerard M. Donovan
Represented By: Carla M Wirtschafter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Koninklijke Philips NV
Represented By: Stephen C Willey
Represented By: Richard A Graham
Represented By: Kirsten R Rydstrom
Represented By: Gerard M. Donovan
Represented By: Carla M Wirtschafter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philips India, LTD.
Represented By: Stephen C Willey
Represented By: Richard A Graham
Represented By: Kirsten R Rydstrom
Represented By: Gerard M. Donovan
Represented By: Carla M Wirtschafter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?