Inland Northwest Renal Care Group LLC v. WebTPA Employer Services LLC
Plaintiff: Inland Northwest Renal Care Group and Inland Northwest Renal Care Group LLC
Defendant: WebTPA Employer Services LLC and First Choice Health Network, Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01758
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Referring Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES RE #21 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/27/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/10/2020, Joint Status Report due by 2/17/2020. (KMP)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: #25 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. Filed by Defendant WebTPA Employer Services LLC. Noting Date 1/17/2020, (Greenberg, Benjamin)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 DECLARATION of Dwight Mankin filed by Defendant WebTPA Employer Services LLC re #25 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Greenberg, Benjamin)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant WebTPA Employer Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/3/2020, (Greenberg, Benjamin)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant First Choice Health Network, Inc mailed on 12/2/2019 (Marney, Carin)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Wendy E Lyon on behalf of Defendant First Choice Health Network, Inc. (Lyon, Wendy)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) WebTPA Employer Services LLC, filed by Inland Northwest Renal Care Group LLC.(Marney, Carin)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 12/12/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/26/2019, Joint Status Report due by 1/2/2020. (KMP)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. The new deadline is 11/27/19. Signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler.(GB)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time by parties (Greenberg, Benjamin)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order re #19 Stipulation NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 11/15/2019. (GB)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re #16 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Adam Santeusanio for Plaintiff Inland Northwest Renal Care Group LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re #15 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Robert Zaffrann for Plaintiff Inland Northwest Renal Care Group LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Adam Santeusanio FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Inland Northwest Renal Care Group LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-6007839 (Marney, Carin)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Robert Zaffrann FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Inland Northwest Renal Care Group LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-6007784 (Marney, Carin)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk William M McCool. Case reassigned to U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour and referred to Hon. Mary Alice Theiler pursuant to Local Rule MJR 6 and General Order 02-19. (KMP)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Andrew J Holly for Defendant WebTPA Employer Services LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Inland Northwest Renal Care Group LLC (Marney, Carin)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Inland Northwest Renal Care Group LLC (Marney, Carin)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time by parties (Greenberg, Benjamin)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Andrew Holly FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant WebTPA Employer Services LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5993940 (Greenberg, Benjamin)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant WebTPA Employer Services LLC (Greenberg, Benjamin)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Carin A Marney on behalf of Plaintiff Inland Northwest Renal Care Group. (Marney, Carin)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Communitas, Inc. for WebTPA Employer Services LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by WebTPA Employer Services LLC (Greenberg, Benjamin)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Defendant WebTPA Employer Services LLC. (Greenberg, Benjamin)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 11/7/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (AE)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (GT)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GT)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Hon. Mary Alice Theiler added. (GT)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Inland Northwest Renal Care Group and WebTPA Employer Services LLC must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 11/7/2019. (GT)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 19-2-24708-8 SEA; (Receipt # 0981-5988553) Attorney Benjamin D Greenberg added to party WebTPA Employer Services LLC(pty:dft), filed by WebTPA Employer Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B)(Greenberg, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Inland Northwest Renal Care Group LLC v. WebTPA Employer Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WebTPA Employer Services LLC
Represented By: Benjamin D Greenberg
Represented By: Andrew J Holly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Choice Health Network, Inc
Represented By: Wendy E Lyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inland Northwest Renal Care Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inland Northwest Renal Care Group LLC
Represented By: Carin A Marney
Represented By: Robert Zaffrann
Represented By: Adam Santeusanio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?