Packaging Corporation of America Inc v. Lundberg LLC et al
Plaintiff: Packaging Corporation of America, Inc. and Packaging Corporation of America Inc
Defendant: Lundberg, LLC, Dustex Corporation, A.H. Lundberg Systems, Inc., Lundberg LLC and AH Lundberg Systems Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01770
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 2/3/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/21/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/27/2020, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)
December 19, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk William M McCool. Case reassigned to Judge Marsha J. Pechman for all further proceedings. Hon. Mary Alice Theiler no longer assigned to case. (KMP)
December 16, 2019 Attorneys Tiffany Scott Connors, Devon John McCurdy for Dustex Corporation added; per #17 Notice of Appearance. (KMP)
December 13, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendants Dustex Corporation, Lundberg LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/24/2020, (Gabel, Andrew)
December 13, 2019 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Dustex Corporation (Gabel, Andrew)
December 13, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Andrew J. Gabel on behalf of Defendant Dustex Corporation. (Gabel, Andrew)
December 4, 2019 Filing 16 JOINT MOTION AND ORDER TO SCHEDULE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT AND ADDITIONAL BRIEFING by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler, re the parties' #14 Stipulation. (TF)
December 4, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on A.H. Lundberg Systems, Inc. on 11/21/2019, filed by Plaintiff Packaging Corporation of America Inc. (Durbin, Christopher)
November 22, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Joint Motion to Schedule Response to Complaint and Additional Briefing by parties (Gabel, Andrew)
November 21, 2019 Attorneys Tiffany Scott Connors, Devon John McCurdy for Lundberg LLC added; per #12 Notice of Appearance. (KMP)
November 20, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Dustex, LLC for Lundberg LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Lundberg LLC (Gabel, Andrew)
November 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Andrew J. Gabel on behalf of Defendant Lundberg LLC. (Gabel, Andrew)
November 14, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on William L. Sutton, Jr. on 11/4/2019, filed by Plaintiff Packaging Corporation of America Inc. (Durbin, Christopher)
November 14, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Lundberg, LLC f/k/a A.H.Lundberg Associates, Inc. on 11/4/2019, filed by Plaintiff Packaging Corporation of America Inc. (Durbin, Christopher)
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Dustex Corporation dba Lox Solutions on 11/4/2019, filed by Plaintiff Packaging Corporation of America Inc. (Durbin, Christopher)
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Capitol Services, Inc. on 11/4/2019, filed by Plaintiff Packaging Corporation of America Inc. (Durbin, Christopher)
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Packaging Corporation of America Inc (Kuwana, Eric)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Andrew D. Barr for Plaintiff Packaging Corporation of America Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Eric A Kuwana for Plaintiff Packaging Corporation of America Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Andrew D. Barr FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Packaging Corporation of America Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5999141 (Durbin, Christopher)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Eric A. Kuwana FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Packaging Corporation of America Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5999128 (Durbin, Christopher)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants AH Lundberg Systems Inc, Dustex Corporation, and Lundberg LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(GT)
November 1, 2019 Hon. Mary Alice Theiler added. (GT)
November 1, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Packaging Corporation of America Inc must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 11/8/2019. (GT)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5990432) Attorney Christopher B. Durbin added to party Packaging Corporation of America, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Packaging Corporation of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew D. Barr in Support of Complaint, #2 Ex A to Declaration of Andrew D. Barr in Support of Complaint, #3 Ex B to Declaration of Andrew D. Barr in Support of Complaint, #4 Ex C to Declaration of Andrew D. Barr in Support of Complaint, #5 Ex D to Declaration of Andrew D. Barr in Support of Complaint, #6 Ex E to Declaration of Andrew D. Barr in Support of Complaint, #7 Ex F to Declaration of Andrew D. Barr in Support of Complaint, #8 Ex G to Declaration of Andrew D. Barr in Support of Complaint, #9 Ex H to Declaration of Andrew D. Barr in Support of Complaint, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Summons to Lundberg, LLC f/k/a A.H. Lundberg Associates, Inc., #12 Summons to Dustex Corporation d/b/a LDX Solutions, #13 Summons to A.H. Lundberg Systems, Inc.)(Durbin, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Packaging Corporation of America Inc v. Lundberg LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lundberg, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustex Corporation
Represented By: Tiffany Scott Connors
Represented By: Devon John McCurdy
Represented By: Andrew J. Gabel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.H. Lundberg Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lundberg LLC
Represented By: Tiffany Scott Connors
Represented By: Devon John McCurdy
Represented By: Andrew J. Gabel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AH Lundberg Systems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Packaging Corporation of America, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher B. Durbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Packaging Corporation of America Inc
Represented By: Christopher B. Durbin
Represented By: Eric A Kuwana
Represented By: Andrew D. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?