Ashwell v. Lockhart et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Dwayne Ashwell
Defendant: Donald J Trump and Sean Paul Lockhart
Case Number: 2:2019cv01788
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated per direction to Clerk in 6 Minute Order re failure to file amended complaint. (PM) cc: copy of docket sheet sent to Plaintiff via first class mail
December 4, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER re: #5 Order Dismissing Complaint. The following MINUTE ORDER is made by direction of the Court, the Honorable Ricardo S. Martinez, Chief United States District Judge: On November 5, 2019, the Court dismissed Plaintiff's Complaint and granted leave to file an amended complaint within 21 days. Dkt. #5. That order warned Plaintiff: "Failure to file an amended complaint will result in this action being closed." Id. at 4. Plaintiff failed to timely file an amended complaint. Accordingly, the Clerk is directed to CLOSE this matter. (CAO)
November 7, 2019 Clerk received phone call from Plaintiff advising of a change of address. Plaintiff is unable to send this change in writing. The docket has been updated to reflect this. Clerk sent a copy of #5 Order to Plaintiff's new address via U.S. Mail. (PM)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER dismissing Plaintiff's Complaint with leave to amend; denying Plaintiff's #4 Motion for Court Appointed Counsel. Amended Complaint due no later than twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM) cc: Plaintiff via first class mail
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Court-Appointed Counsel, filed by Plaintiff Daniel Dwayne Ashwell. Noted by Clerk for 11/22/2019. (PM)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Sean Paul Lockhart, Donald J Trump (Receipt # IFP Granted), filed by Daniel Dwayne Ashwell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (PM)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (PM) cc: Plaintiff via first class mail
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Michelle L. Peterson , filed by Daniel Dwayne Ashwell. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Application for Court Appointed Counsel)(GT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashwell v. Lockhart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J Trump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Paul Lockhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Dwayne Ashwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?