Red Dot Corporation v. The Travelers Indemnity Company et al
Plaintiff: Red Dot Corporation
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company f/k/a The Aetna Casualty and Surety Company, St.Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company, St Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv01802
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., for The Travelers Indemnity Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company (Rumsey, T)
December 17, 2019 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp, Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Companies, Inc for Travelers Casualty and Surety Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company (Rumsey, T)
December 17, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Companies Inc for St Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by St Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company (Rumsey, T)
December 17, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by St Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company.(Rumsey, T)
December 4, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' #11 Stipulated Motion to Extend Time To Answer. The Court ORDERS that Defendants shall file their answers to the complaint no later than December 17, 2019. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
December 3, 2019 Filing 11 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Time To Answer, filed by Defendants St Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company. Noting Date 12/3/2019, (Rumsey, T)
November 27, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney T Arlen Rumsey on behalf of Defendants St Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company. (Rumsey, T)
November 22, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case, or that attorney's representative, should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation; If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, local counsel should attend on behalf of non-local counsel. If local counsel is unavailable, non-local counsel may make arrangements to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at 206-370-8805 at least TEN (10) DAYS in advance of the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. A Status Conference is set for 3/31/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company on 11/12/2019, filed by Plaintiff Red Dot Corporation. (Harper, Gregory)
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to Travelers Casualty and Surety Company on 11/12/2019, filed by Plaintiff Red Dot Corporation. (Harper, Gregory)
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to The Travelers Indemnity Company filed by Plaintiff Red Dot Corporation (Harper, Gregory)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Red Dot Corporation (Harper, Gregory)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants The Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company and St Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(GT)
November 7, 2019 U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour added. (GT)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Red Dot Corporation (Davis, Charles)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief and Damages against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5998670), filed by Red Dot Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons The Travelers Indemnity Company, #3 Summons Travelers Casualty and Surety Company, #4 Summons St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company)(Davis, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Red Dot Corporation v. The Travelers Indemnity Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company f/k/a The Aetna Casualty and Surety Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St.Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: T Arlen Rumsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: T Arlen Rumsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company
Represented By: T Arlen Rumsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Red Dot Corporation
Represented By: Charles K Davis
Represented By: Gregory L Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?