Brickman v. Bonneville International Corporation
Plaintiff: Ashlie Brickman
Defendant: Bonneville International Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv01804
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 15 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from District of Colorado and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GT)
November 6, 2019 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (GT)
November 6, 2019 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of Colorado, Case Number 1:19-cv-02626.
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The #12 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. Defendant Bonneville International Corporation may have up to and including, 11/26/2019, to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. In addition, in light of the unopposed nature of the #12 Motion to Transfer Case, the Scheduling Conference set before this Court is VACATED and shall be reset by the transferee Court. Finally, the Motion to Transfer pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404 is GRANTED. This case shall be transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Washington. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 10/28/2019. Text Only Entry(skclc1) [Transferred from cod on 11/6/2019.]
October 22, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Case to the Western District of Washington, Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, , Unopposed MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Defendant Bonneville International Corporation. (Kissinger, Ashley) [Transferred from cod on 11/6/2019.]
October 22, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Deseret Management Corporation, Corporate Parent DMC Reserve Trust for Bonneville International Corporation. (Kissinger, Ashley) [Transferred from cod on 11/6/2019.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 10 ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY AND COURT: Under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3(a), RICHARD LIEBOWITZ was administratively removed from the court's attorney roll and barred from filing electronically under CM/ECF for failing to pay the 2018 Biennial Fee. Counsel must complete a Bar/ECF application through counsel's Attorney Services Portal account and pay the full application fee to be restored to the attorney roll and CM/ECF. Upon reinstatement, counsel must file a Notice of Entry of Appearance in this case. (Text Only Entry) (mfred) [Transferred from cod on 11/6/2019.]
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 11/21/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 11/14/2019. Consent Form due by 11/14/2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 10/4/19. Text Only Entry (amont, ) [Transferred from cod on 11/6/2019.]
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Bonneville International Corporation. Bonneville International Corporation answer due 10/28/2019. (Kissinger, Ashley) [Transferred from cod on 11/6/2019.]
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ashley I. Kissinger on behalf of Bonneville International CorporationAttorney Ashley I. Kissinger added to party Bonneville International Corporation(pty:dft) (Kissinger, Ashley) [Transferred from cod on 11/6/2019.]
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (angar, ) [Transferred from cod on 11/6/2019.]
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-2626-SKC (angar, ) [Transferred from cod on 11/6/2019.]
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, ) [Transferred from cod on 11/6/2019.]
September 15, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (rvill, ) [Transferred from cod on 11/6/2019.]
September 15, 2019 Filing 2 Report re Copyright: Report on the filing of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (rvill, ) Modified to correct file date on 9/16/2019 (rvill, ). [Transferred from cod on 11/6/2019.]
September 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bonneville International Corporation (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6894651)Attorney Richard Liebowitz added to party Ashlie Brickman(pty:pla), filed by Ashlie Brickman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Copyright Form)(Liebowitz, Richard) [Transferred from cod on 11/6/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brickman v. Bonneville International Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashlie Brickman
Represented By: PRO HAC VICE PENDING
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonneville International Corporation
Represented By: PRO HAC VICE PENDING
Represented By: Ashley I. Kissinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?