McFadden v. Temple Corporation of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints
Plaintiff: Patricia McFadden
Defendant: Temple Corporation of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints
Case Number: 2:2019cv01806
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case, or that attorney's representative, should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation; If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, local counsel should attend on behalf of non-local counsel. If local counsel is unavailable, non-local counsel may make arrangements to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at 206-370-8805 at least TEN (10) DAYS in advance of the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. A Status Conference is set for 3/31/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint; by Temple Corporation of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints.(Rosenberger, Michael)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Temple Corporation of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints (Rosenberger, Michael)
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Patricia McFadden (Bridges, Dan)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Defendant Temple Corporation of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints. (Rosenberger, Michael)
November 7, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 11/14/2019. (SNP)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (SNP)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SNP)
November 7, 2019 U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour added. (SNP)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number No case number; (Receipt # 0981-5999470), filed by Temple Corporation of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(Rosenberger, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McFadden v. Temple Corporation of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Temple Corporation of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints
Represented By: Michael Rosenberger
Represented By: Chelsey Lyn Mam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia McFadden
Represented By: Dan W Bridges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?