Munning v. Nordstrom Inc et al
Plaintiff: Laurie Munning
Defendant: Nordstrom Inc and Does 1-20
Case Number: 2:2019cv01810
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY, filed by Defendant Nordstrom Inc, TO RESPONSE to #11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration or to Dismiss (Guite, Robert)
December 16, 2019 Filing 24 DECLARATION of Che Corrington filed by Plaintiff Laurie Munning re #11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration or to Dismiss (Corrington, Che)
December 16, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Laurie Munning, to #11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration or to Dismiss. (Corrington, Che)
December 12, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Anne Marie Loucks. Filed by Defendant Nordstrom Inc. (Loucks, Anne) Changed firm association and address info on 12/12/2019 (DS).
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re #18 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jay T Ramsey for Defendant Nordstrom Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re #17 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney P Craig Cardon for Defendant Nordstrom Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
December 12, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Anne Marie Loucks on behalf of Defendant Nordstrom Inc. (Loucks, Anne)
December 11, 2019 Filing 18 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jay T. Ramsey FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Nordstrom Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-6047135 (Loucks, Anne)
December 11, 2019 Filing 17 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY P. Craig Cardon FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Nordstrom Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-6047133 (Loucks, Anne)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying Defendant Nordstrom, Inc.'s #10 Motion to Waive Physical Office Requirement for Counsel Supporting the Application of P. Craig Cardon and Jay T. Ramsey to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TH)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AMENDED ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 1/24/2020, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting Parties' #13 Stipulated Motion: Defendant's #11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration or to Dismiss is renoted for 12/20/2019. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (MW)
November 26, 2019 Filing 13 Stipulated MOTION and Proposed Order to Extend Deadline for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss (Dkt. 11), filed by Plaintiff Laurie Munning. Noting Date 11/26/2019, (Corrington, Che)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 12/19/2019, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR) (Main Document 12 replaced on 11/21/2019) (KERR).
November 14, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration or to Dismiss, filed by Defendant Nordstrom Inc. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Julie Blume, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A-F to Declaration of Julie Blume, #3 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/20/2019 12/6/2019, (Guite, Robert) Modified on 11/27/2019 (MW).
November 12, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION Waive Physical Office Requirement , filed by Defendant Nordstrom Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert J. Guite, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - P Craig Cardon, #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Jay T Ramsey) Noting Date 11/29/2019, (Guite, Robert)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Shane T Prince for Plaintiff Laurie Munning, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Stephen P DeNittis for Plaintiff Laurie Munning, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Shane T. Prince FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Laurie Munning (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-6005513 (Corrington, Che)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Stephen P. DeNittis FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Laurie Munning (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-6005495 (Corrington, Che)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant Nordstrom Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Robert J. Guite, #2 Exhibit B to Declaration of Robert J. Guite, #3 Certificate of Service)(Guite, Robert)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Nordstrom Inc (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service via Mail)(Guite, Robert)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. ad hoc to attorneys DeNittis and Prince. (GT)
November 8, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Nordstrom Inc must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 11/15/2019. (GT)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. ad hoc to attorneys DeNittis and Prince. (GT)
November 8, 2019 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (GT)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from KING COUNTY, case number 19-2-26191-9-SEA; (Receipt # 0981-6000426) Attorney Robert J Guite added to party Nordstrom Inc(pty:dft), filed by Nordstrom Inc. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Exhibit A, #2 Jury Demand Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Declaration of Julie Blume)(Guite, Robert) Modified on 11/8/2019 (GT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Munning v. Nordstrom Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nordstrom Inc
Represented By: Robert J Guite
Represented By: Jay T Ramsey
Represented By: P Craig Cardon
Represented By: Anne Marie Loucks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Munning
Represented By: Che Z Corrington
Represented By: Daniel M Hattis
Represented By: Stephen P DeNittis
Represented By: Shane T Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?