Decker v. Unigard Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Diane Decker
Defendant: Unigard Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv01842
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 13 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Unigard Insurance Company, filed by Diane Decker. (TH)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Amend Complaint re parties' #11 Stipulation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff, DIANE DECKER is granted leave to amend to file her First Amended Complaint, a copy of which is attached hereto as Exhibit "B." IT IS ALSO ORDERED that Defendant's responsive pleading shall be due thirty (30) days after the First Amended Complaint is filed. IT IS FURTHERED ORDERED that the First Amended Complaint is deemed filed as of the date this Order is transmitted via the CM/ECF system. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (TH)
January 8, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO AMEND COMPLAINT by parties (Iodice, Mark)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 1/23/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/9/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/16/2020, by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM)
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Unigard Insurance Company (Kim, Sally)
November 20, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint; and Affirmative Defenses by Unigard Insurance Company.(Kim, Sally)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Donald J Verfurth on behalf of Defendant Unigard Insurance Company. (Verfurth, Donald)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Notice of Removal ; filed by Defendant Unigard Insurance Company. (Kim, Sally)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (GT)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GT)
November 14, 2019 Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (GT)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate QBE Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate QBE Insurance Group, Limited for Unigard Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Unigard Insurance Company (Kim, Sally)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 19-2-26827-1 KNT; (Receipt # 0981-6008900), filed by Unigard Insurance Company.(Kim, Sally) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/14/2019: #1 Complaint) (GT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Decker v. Unigard Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unigard Insurance Company
Represented By: Donald J Verfurth
Represented By: Sally Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Decker
Represented By: Shane M. Moriarty
Represented By: Mark Iodice
Represented By: Douglas T Weinmaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?