United Food and Commercial Workers Union Local 21 v. Providence Health & Services Washington
Plaintiff: United Food and Commercial Workers Union Local No 21
Defendant: Providence Health & Services Washington
Case Number: 2:2019cv01862
Filed: November 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Theresa L Fricke
Referring Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:01851m
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Providence Health & Services Washington.(Lehmann, Paula)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 2/11/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/28/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/11/2020, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD)
December 12, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Thomas S. Zilly for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke no longer assigned to case. By Traci Whiteley, Deputy Clerk, for Clerk William M McCool. (TW)
December 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 12/12/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (TW)
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Naazaneen Hodjat on behalf of Defendant Providence Health & Services Washington. (Hodjat, Naazaneen)
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Providence Health & Services Washington (Lehmann, Paula)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Paula L Lehmann on behalf of Defendant Providence Health & Services Washington. (Lehmann, Paula)
November 18, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 11/25/2019 (if applicable). (SNP)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Providence Health & Services Washington. (SNP)
November 18, 2019 Judge Theresa L Fricke added. (SNP)
November 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Providence Health & Services Washington (Receipt # 0981-6013466), filed by United Food and Commercial Workers Local 21. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(McGuinness, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Food and Commercial Workers Union Local 21 v. Providence Health & Services Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Food and Commercial Workers Union Local No 21
Represented By: James Gerard McGuinness
Represented By: Aaron M Streepy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence Health & Services Washington
Represented By: Paula L Lehmann
Represented By: Naazaneen Hodjat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?