Aquarian Foundation v. Lowndes et al
Plaintiff: Aquarian Foundation
Defendant: Bruce Kimberly Lowndes, Philosophy Research Center, John/Jane Doe #1-10, Sankacharya Sunkara, Mark Lowndes, Cheri Lowndes, www.higherspritualism.org, Margaret Kvesic, Allen M Jenne, Matthew Lowndes, Daryl Wardenaar, vk.com, Ann Swerman Born, vimeo.com, www.pr.org.au, Anne S Jenne, www.hispirit.org, Lynea S Weatherly, HigherSpiritualism, Jane Doe Lowndes and John/Jane Doe #1-100
Case Number: 2:2019cv01879
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney William Walter Spencer on behalf of Defendant Anne S Jenne. (Spencer, William)
January 7, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney William Walter Spencer on behalf of Defendant Allen M Jenne. (Spencer, William)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #11 Motion for Extension of Time. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 3/30/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/8/2020, Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan due by 4/20/2020. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
December 19, 2019 Filing 12 PRAECIPE to attach document (Praecipe to attach signed declaration) re #11 MOTION for Extension of Time for initial disclosures, joint status report, and early settlement by Plaintiff Aquarian Foundation (Schiedler-Brown, Jean)
December 17, 2019 NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The #11 -1 Declaration of Jean Schiedler-Brown re: Motion for Extension of Time, was improperly signed by Jean Schiedler-Brown. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. Please file corrected signature page using Praecipe to Attach event and link to original filing. (PM)
December 16, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time for initial disclosures, joint status report, and early settlement, filed by Plaintiff Aquarian Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/3/2020, (Schiedler-Brown, Jean)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 1/24/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/10/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/17/2020, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW)
November 25, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Aquarian Foundation (Schiedler-Brown, Jean)
November 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE to Withdraw Pending Motion re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ; by Plaintiff Aquarian Foundation. (Schiedler-Brown, Jean)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re Plaintiff's #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. The Court DIRECTS Plaintiff to serve a copy of all filings in this case on all named Defendants, including this Order, by no later than noon on Friday, November 22, 2019, and to provide the Court with proof of service no later than 3 p.m. that same day. The Court will extend the deadlines for Defendants to file notices of intent to respond and to respond. Defendants shall have until noon on November 25, 2019, to file notices and until noon on November 26, 2019, to file responses, if any. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
November 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,,,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (GT)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants Allen M Jenne, Anne S Jenne, Margaret Kvesic, Bruce Kimberly Lowndes, Cheri Lowndes, Jane Doe Lowndes(his wife), Mark Lowndes, Matthew Lowndes, Daryl Wardenaar, and Lynea S Weatherly. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons)(GT) (Attachment 3 replaced on 11/20/2019) (GT).
November 19, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Aquarian Foundation must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 11/26/2019. (GT)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office. (GT)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office. (GT)
November 19, 2019 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (GT)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , filed by Plaintiff Aquarian Foundation The. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Reverend Jannifer Werner, TRO, and exhibits, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Jean Schiedler-Brown and exhibits 1--4) Noting Date 11/19/2019, (Schiedler-Brown, Jean)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-6017169) Attorney Jean M. Schiedler-Brown added to party Aquarian Foundation The(pty:pla), filed by Aquarian Foundation The. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Report on Copyrights (AO Form 121) Schedule A, #3 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120) Schedule B, #4 Supplement Unpublished trade secrets,C, #5 Summons Kvesic, dba Calavera Productions, #6 Summons Calavera Productions, #7 Summons Wardenaar, dba DPWTECH, #8 Summons Allen Jenne, #9 Summons Anne Jenne, #10 Summons Lowndes, Bruce;aka's, dba,/resdential address, #11 Summons Lowndes,Bruce;aka's,dba,business address, #12 Summons Cheri Lowndes, #13 Summons Lowndes,Jane Doe, wife of Mark, #14 Summons Lowndes, Mark, #15 Summons Lowndes, Jane D, wife of Matthew, #16 Summons Lowndes, Matthew, #17 Summons Weatherly, Lynea)(Schiedler-Brown, Jean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aquarian Foundation v. Lowndes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Kimberly Lowndes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philosophy Research Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe #1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sankacharya Sunkara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Lowndes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheri Lowndes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: www.higherspritualism.org
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Kvesic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen M Jenne
Represented By: William Walter Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Lowndes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daryl Wardenaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: vk.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Swerman Born
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: vimeo.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: www.pr.org.au
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne S Jenne
Represented By: William Walter Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: www.hispirit.org
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynea S Weatherly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HigherSpiritualism
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Lowndes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe #1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aquarian Foundation
Represented By: Jean M. Schiedler-Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?