DiscoverOrg Data LLC v. Factspan Inc
Plaintiff: DiscoverOrg Data, LLC and DiscoverOrg Data LLC
Defendant: Factspan, Inc. and Factspan Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01893
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 ***Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) Civil Case Terminated re Plaintiff's #9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (case) (TH)
January 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff DiscoverOrg Data LLC (Sands, Darin)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER granting the parties' #7 stipulated motion for extension. The deadline for defendant to file a responsive pleading or motion is EXTENDED to January 3, 2020. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM)
December 17, 2019 Filing 7 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , filed by Defendant Factspan Inc. Noting Date 12/17/2019, (Skok, Gavin)
December 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Gavin William Skok on behalf of Defendant Factspan Inc. (Skok, Gavin)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 1/27/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/13/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/27/2020, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD)
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office. (GT)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Factspan Inc. (GT)
November 22, 2019 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (GT)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent DiscoverOrg Holdings, LLC for DiscoverOrg Data, LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by DiscoverOrg Data, LLC (Sands, Darin)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Factspan, Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-6020833), filed by DiscoverOrg Data, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Report on Copyrights (AO Form 121))(Sands, Darin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DiscoverOrg Data LLC v. Factspan Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DiscoverOrg Data, LLC
Represented By: Darin M Sands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DiscoverOrg Data LLC
Represented By: Darin M Sands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Factspan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Factspan Inc
Represented By: Gavin William Skok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?