Fourstar et al v Trump et al
Plaintiff: Victor Charles Fourstar, Jr., Bruce John Denny, David Allen McQueen, Bruce Lewis, Aloysious Wells, Richie Gaylord Shane, Alexander Hawatmeh, Samuel Edward Michael, Clint Scott Soosay, Paul Micheal Bergin and Eric Solcol
Defendant: Unknown Officials of Designation and Sentence Computation Center (Grand Prairie, Texas), Connie Tonini, Israel Jacquez, Jaine Sjodin, Kim Huston, Jame Greene, Dave Erickson, William Barr, Karen Parra, James Parker, Ted Cantu, Maggie Dy, United States Parole Commission, Jonathan Barkley, Elaine Rozkuszka, Kathleen Hawk-Sawyer, Thomas Ellis, Corrine James, William Haven, Andrew Grassley, Dominic Ayotte, Dennis Radcliff, Jennifer Myer, Donald Trump and Nicole Bell
Case Number: 2:2019cv01899
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Referring Judge: Michelle L Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name Filed by Plaintiff Victor Charles Fourstar, Jr. (address updated this date)(SG)
December 17, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff Paul Micheal Bergin has until 1/17/2020 to correct IFP deficiency. (ST)
December 17, 2019 Filing 26 LETTER sent to plaintiff Paul Micheal Bergin, re IFP deficiency; - Please provide a certified copy of your prison trust account statement showing transactions for the last 6 months. Filer has until 1/17/2020 to correct. (cc: plaintiff via USPS)
December 13, 2019 Filing 25 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff Paul Micheal Bergin. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Exhibit, #3 Summons, #4 MOTION for Extension to File Trust Account Statement)(ST)
December 13, 2019 IFP deficiency corrected in part as to plaintiff Paul Michael Bergin. (ST)
December 9, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Bruce John Denny. (Attachments: #1 Prison Trust Account Statement, #2 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #3 Exhibit, #4 Supplemental Information re: IFP, #5 Summons)(SG) Modified on 12/17/2019. Dkt# 1-4 stricken as the document only applies to plaintiff Fourstar.
December 9, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Alexander Hawatmeh. (Attachments: #1 Prison Trust Account Statement, #2 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #3 Exhibit, #4 Supplemental Information re: IFP, #5 Summons)(SG) Modified on 12/17/2019. Dkt# 1-4 stricken as the document only applies to plaintiff Fourstar.
December 9, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Samuel Edward Michael. (Attachments: #1 Prison Trust Account Statement, #2 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #3 Exhibit, #4 Supplemental Information re: IFP, #5 Summons)(SG) Modified on 12/17/2019. Dkt# 1-4 stricken as the document only applies to plaintiff Fourstar. (ST)
December 9, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Victor Charles Fourstar, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Prison Trust Account Statement, #2 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #3 Exhibit, #4 Supplemental Information re: IFP (SG) #5 Summons) (SG).
December 9, 2019 IFP deficiency corrected as to plaintiff(s) Fourstar; Michael; Hawatmeh; Denny (SG)
December 3, 2019 Filing 16 Mail addressed to Clint Soosay returned as Undeliverable re #6 Letter. (ST)
December 2, 2019 Filing 20 Mail addressed to David McQueen returned as Undeliverable re #10 Letter, (ST)
December 2, 2019 Filing 19 Mail addressed to Eric Solcol returned as Undeliverable re #13 Letter, (ST)
December 2, 2019 Filing 18 Mail addressed to Aloysious Wells returned as Undeliverable re #9 Letter, (ST)
December 2, 2019 Filing 17 Mail addressed to Richie Shane returned as Undeliverable re #7 Letter, (ST)
November 22, 2019 Filing 15 LETTER sent to Bruce Lewis, re IFP deficiency; - The filing fee requirement must be met. Please submit the full $400.00 filing fee or an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (IFP). An IFP form is enclosed for your convenience. Filer has until 12/23/2019 to correct. (cc: plaintiff w/IFP form via USPS) (ST) (ST)
November 22, 2019 Filing 14 LETTER sent to Samuel Edward Michael, re IFP deficiency; - The filing fee requirement must be met. Please submit the full $400.00 filing fee or an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (IFP). An IFP form is enclosed for your convenience. Filer has until 12/23/2019 to correct. (cc: plaintiff w/IFP form via USPS) (ST) (ST)
November 22, 2019 Filing 13 LETTER sent to Eric Solcol, re IFP deficiency; - The filing fee requirement must be met. Please submit the full $400.00 filing fee or an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (IFP). An IFP form is enclosed for your convenience. Filer has until 12/23/2019 to correct. (cc: plaintiff w/IFP form via USPS) (ST) (ST)
November 22, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER sent to Alexander Hawatmeh, re IFP deficiency; - The filing fee requirement must be met. Please submit the full $400.00 filing fee or an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (IFP). An IFP form is enclosed for your convenience. Filer has until 12/23/2019 to correct. (cc: plaintiff w/IFP form via USPS) (ST) (ST)
November 22, 2019 Filing 11 LETTER sent to Paul Micheal Bergin, re IFP deficiency; - The filing fee requirement must be met. Please submit the full $400.00 filing fee or an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (IFP). An IFP form is enclosed for your convenience. Filer has until 12/23/2019 to correct. (cc: plaintiff w/IFP form via USPS) (ST)
November 22, 2019 Filing 10 LETTER sent to David Allen McQueen, re IFP deficiency; - The filing fee requirement must be met. Please submit the full $400.00 filing fee or an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (IFP). An IFP form is enclosed for your convenience. Filer has until 12/23/2019 to correct. (cc: plaintiff w/IFP form via USPS) (ST)
November 22, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER sent to Aloysious Wells, re IFP deficiency; - The filing fee requirement must be met. Please submit the full $400.00 filing fee or an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (IFP). An IFP form is enclosed for your convenience. Filer has until 12/23/2019 to correct. (cc: plaintiff w/IFP form via USPS) (ST)
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER sent to Bruce John Denny, re IFP deficiency; - The filing fee requirement must be met. Please submit the full $400.00 filing fee or an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (IFP). An IFP form is enclosed for your convenience. Filer has until 12/23/2019 to correct. (cc: plaintiff w/IFP form via USPS) (ST)
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER sent to Richie Gaylord Shane, re IFP deficiency; - The filing fee requirement must be met. Please submit the full $400.00 filing fee or an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (IFP). An IFP form is enclosed for your convenience. Filer has until 12/23/2019 to correct. (cc: plaintiff w/IFP form via USPS) (ST)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER sent to Clint Scott Soosay, re IFP deficiency; - The filing fee requirement must be met. Please submit the full $400.00 filing fee or an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (IFP). An IFP form is enclosed for your convenience. Filer has until 12/23/2019 to correct. (cc: plaintiff w/IFP form via USPS) (ST)
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER sent to Victor Charles Fourstar, Jr., re IFP deficiency; - The proper IFP form was not submitted. Enclosed please find the correct IFP form to be filled out in full and returned to the Court. Filer has until 12/23/2019 to correct. (cc: plaintiff w/IFP form via USPS) (ST)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff Victor Charles Fourstar, Jr. NOTE: Plaintiff(s) Paul Micahel Bergin, Bruce John Denny, Alexander Hawatmeh, David Allen McQueen, Samuel Edward Michael, Richie Gaylord Shane, Eric Solcol, Clint Scott Soosay, Aloysious Wells did not pay the filing fee or submit an IFP and will each receive a deficiency notice. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Exhibit, #3 Prison Trust Account re Victor Fourstar, Jr., #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons)(ST) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/22/2019: #6 Supplemental Information re IFP) (ST).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fourstar et al v Trump et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Officials of Designation and Sentence Computation Center (Grand Prairie, Texas)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Tonini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Israel Jacquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaine Sjodin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Huston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jame Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Parra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Cantu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maggie Dy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Parole Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Barkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elaine Rozkuszka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Hawk-Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrine James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Haven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Grassley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominic Ayotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Radcliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Myer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Trump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Charles Fourstar, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce John Denny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Allen McQueen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aloysious Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richie Gaylord Shane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Hawatmeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Edward Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clint Scott Soosay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Micheal Bergin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Solcol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?