Young et al v. iFinex Inc et al
Plaintiff: Adam Kurtz and Eric Young
Defendant: DIGFINEX Inc, Tether Holdings Limited, BFXWW Inc, IFINEX Inc, Tether Limited, Tether International Limited, John Does 1-50, Tether Operations Limited and BFXNA Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01902
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 ***Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) Civil Case Terminated re Plaintiffs' #13 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (case) (TH)
January 7, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiffs Adam Kurtz, Eric Young (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Townsend, Roger)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying the parties' #10 Stipulation to transfer this matter to the Southern District of New York without prejudice to re-filing the stipulation in a manner that complies with the strictures of 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
January 3, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Judith B Jennison on behalf of Defendants BFXNA Inc, BFXWW Inc, DigFinex Inc, John Does 1-50, Tether Holdings Limited, Tether International Limited, Tether Limited, Tether Operations Limited, iFinex Inc. (Jennison, Judith)
January 2, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) by parties (Jennison, Judith)(refiled to include new attorney signatures) Modified on 1/3/2020 (MW).
December 30, 2019 Filing 9 [See #10 ] STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Transfer Venue by parties (Townsend, Roger) Modified on 1/3/2020 (MW).
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Anthony E Maneiro for Adam Kurtz and Eric Young, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Karen M Lerner for Adam Kurtz and Eric Young, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney David E Kovel for Adam Kurtz and Eric Young, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Anthony E. Maneiro FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Adam Kurtz, Eric Young (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-6024898 (Townsend, Roger)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Karen M. Lerner FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Adam Kurtz, Eric Young (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-6024893 (Townsend, Roger)
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY David E. Kovel FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Adam Kurtz, Eric Young (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-6024883 (Townsend, Roger)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants BFXNA Inc, BFXWW Inc, DigFinex Inc, Tether Holdings Limited, Tether International Limited, Tether Limited, Tether Operations Limited, and iFinex Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(GT)
November 25, 2019 Judge James L. Robart added. (GT)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-6023018) Attorney Roger M Townsend added to party Adam Kurtz(pty:pla), Attorney Roger M Townsend added to party Eric Young(pty:pla), filed by Adam Kurtz, Eric Young. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons BFXNA, #3 Summons BFXWW, #4 Summons DigFinex, #5 Summons iFinex, #6 Summons Tether Holdings, #7 Summons Tether International, #8 Summons Tether Limited, #9 Summons Tether Operations)(Townsend, Roger)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young et al v. iFinex Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIGFINEX Inc
Represented By: Judith B Jennison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tether Holdings Limited
Represented By: Judith B Jennison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BFXWW Inc
Represented By: Judith B Jennison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IFINEX Inc
Represented By: Judith B Jennison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tether Limited
Represented By: Judith B Jennison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tether International Limited
Represented By: Judith B Jennison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-50
Represented By: Judith B Jennison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tether Operations Limited
Represented By: Judith B Jennison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BFXNA Inc
Represented By: Judith B Jennison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Kurtz
Represented By: Roger M Townsend
Represented By: Karen M Lerner
Represented By: David E Kovel
Represented By: Anthony E Maneiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Young
Represented By: Roger M Townsend
Represented By: Karen M Lerner
Represented By: David E Kovel
Represented By: Anthony E Maneiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?