MatconUSA LP v. Houston Casualty Company
Plaintiff: MatconUSA LP
Defendant: Houston Casualty Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv01952
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Tokio Marine & National Fire Insurance Co., Ltd., Corporate Parent Illium, Inc. for Houston Casualty Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Houston Casualty Company (Philip, Neal)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Kyle John Silk-Eglit. Filed by Defendant Houston Casualty Company. (Silk-Eglit, Kyle) Changed firm association on 1/3/2020 (DS).
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Houston Casualty Company.(Philip, Neal)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James L. Robart for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke no longer assigned to case. By Traci Whiteley, Deputy Clerk, for Clerk William M McCool. (TW)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 12/20/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (TW)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Neal J Philip on behalf of Defendant Houston Casualty Company. (Philip, Neal)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to Houston Casualty Company on 12/4/2019, filed by Plaintiff MatconUSA LP. (Harper, Gregory)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff MatconUSA LP (Harper, Gregory)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Houston Casualty Company. (SNP)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by MatconUSA LP (Williams, Thomas)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Judge Theresa L Fricke added. (SNP)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief and Damages against defendant(s) Houston Casualty Company with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-6029726), filed by MatconUSA LP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Williams, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MatconUSA LP v. Houston Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houston Casualty Company
Represented By: Kyle John Silk-Eglit
Represented By: Neal J Philip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MatconUSA LP
Represented By: Thomas M. Williams
Represented By: Gregory L Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?