Eckard v. Cornell et al
Plaintiff: Gabriel Allen Eckard
Defendant: Ty Trenary and Adam Cornell
Case Number: 2:2019cv01961
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Referring Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida re #1 Application filed by Gabriel Allen Eckard. Objections to R&R due by 12/17/2019, Noting Date 12/19/2019, (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)(SG)
December 2, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER sent re IFP deficiency; - Signature is missing from the document(s). Please sign as appropriate.- ***Sign page 3 of IFP Application*** Filer has until 1/2/2020 to correct (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (SG)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff Gabriel Allen Eckard. (Attachments: #1 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Prison Trust Account Statement)(SG) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/4/2019) (SG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eckard v. Cornell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Allen Eckard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ty Trenary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Cornell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?