Maier v. Snohomish County Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Michael-John Frederick Maier
Defendant: Snohomish County Corrections, Kitchen Supervisor and Medical Staff
Case Number: 2:2019cv02007
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Referring Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Filing 7 JUDGMENT BY COURT in favor of Kitchen Supervisor, Medical Staff, Snohomish County Corrections against Michael-John Frederick Maier. The Report and Recommendation is adopted and approved. The case is dismissed with prejudice. (cc: Plaintiff via USPS) (SG)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez re #4 Report and Recommendations. The Court ADOPTS the Report and Recommendation. The case is dismissed with prejudice and the IFP application is stricken as moot. (cc: Plaintiff via USPS) (SG)
December 18, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff Michael-John Frederick Maier. (Report and Recommendation pending, posted as Application) (SG)
December 10, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida re #1 Application filed by Michael-John Frederick Maier. Objections to R&R due by 12/24/2019, Noting Date 12/27/2019, (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Judgment)(SG) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER sent re IFP deficiency; - Please provide a certified copy of your prison trust account statement showing transactions for the last six months.- Signature is missing from the document(s). Please sign as appropriate.- ***page 3 missing signature*** Please sign in all areas where signature required. Filer has until 1/8/2020 to correct (SG)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed Informa Pauperis by Plaintiff Michael-John Frederick Maier. (Attachments: #1 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint)(SG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maier v. Snohomish County Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snohomish County Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kitchen Supervisor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael-John Frederick Maier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?