Tomelleri v. Calkins
Plaintiff: Joseph R Tomelleri
Defendant: Shawn Calkins
Case Number: 2:2019cv02037
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Scott Joseph Strohm for Plaintiff Joseph R Tomelleri, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
January 30, 2020 Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Scott J. Strohm FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Joseph R Tomelleri (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6112564 (Haberthur, Phillip)
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 PRAECIPE to attach document (COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement and Violation of DMCA) re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Joseph R Tomelleri (Haberthur, Phillip)
December 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #2 Summons Issued. (Service of corrected image is attached). (SP)
December 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions.Corrected signature page must be filed by 12/30/2019. (SP)
December 16, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office. (SP)
December 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant Shawn Calkins. (SP) (Main Document 2 replaced on 12/16/2019) (SP).
December 16, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER: ***Case Terminated-Incorrect Division*** Civil case number 3:19-cv-06192 has been terminated. The incorrect divisional office was selected by the filer upon case opening. This case has now been assigned a Seattle case number and Judge. All future filings shall bear the following case number: 2:19-cv-02037-RSL. Before initiating a new case, please review the #Attorney Case Opening Guide (PDF) to determine the correct divisional jurisdiction. (SP)
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement and Violation of DMCA against defendant(s) Shawn Calkins with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-6048342), filed by Joseph R. Tomelleri. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120))(Haberthur, Phillip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tomelleri v. Calkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Calkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph R Tomelleri
Represented By: Bradley W Andersen
Represented By: Phillip J. Haberthur
Represented By: Scott Joseph Strohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?