Young v. Mitsubishi Motors North America Corporation Inc et al
Plaintiff: IRY, Robert Young and Mitsubishi Motors Corporation
Defendant: Mitsubishi Motors North America Corp, Inc. and Mitsubishi Motors North America Corporation Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv02070
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Janet Hickson for Mitsubishi Motors North America Corporation Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Laura M. Booth for Defendant Mitsubishi Motors North America Corporation Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Claire Hillman for Defendant Mitsubishi Motors North America Corporation Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
February 3, 2020 Filing 10 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Claire Hillman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Mitsubishi Motors North America Corporation Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6119236 (Christie, Robert)
February 3, 2020 Filing 9 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Laura Booth FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Mitsubishi Motors North America Corporation Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6119229 (Christie, Robert)
February 3, 2020 Filing 8 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Janet Hickson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Mitsubishi Motors North America Corporation Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6119195 (Christie, Robert)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 2/24/2020, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
January 21, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND by Mitsubishi Motors Corporation, Mitsubishi Motors North America Corporation Inc.(Christie, Robert)
January 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Megan Maria Coluccio on behalf of Defendants Mitsubishi Motors Corporation, Mitsubishi Motors North America Corporation Inc. (Coluccio, Megan)
January 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Robert Leslie Christie on behalf of Defendants Mitsubishi Motors Corporation, Mitsubishi Motors North America Corporation Inc. (Christie, Robert)
January 13, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on MITSUBISHI MOTORS NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION, INC on 12/31/2019, filed by Plaintiff Robert Young. (Lebank, Micah)
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons)(CDA)
December 23, 2019 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (CDA)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Mitsubishi Motors Corporation, Mitsubishi Motors North America Corp, Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-6060608) Attorney John R. Connelly, Jr added to party IRY(pty:pla), Attorney John R. Connelly, Jr added to party Robert Young(pty:pla), filed by Robert Young, IRY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Connelly, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Mitsubishi Motors North America Corporation Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IRY
Represented By: John R. Connelly, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Young
Represented By: John R. Connelly, Jr.
Represented By: Jackson Robert Pahlke
Represented By: Micah R Lebank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitsubishi Motors Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsubishi Motors North America Corp, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsubishi Motors North America Corporation Inc
Represented By: Janet Hickson
Represented By: Laura M. Booth
Represented By: Claire Hillman
Represented By: Robert Leslie Christie
Represented By: Megan Maria Coluccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?