McKoby v. Inslee et al
Plaintiff: William McKoby
Defendant: Donna Kay Tucker, Margaret Jane King, William Hall, John Doe, Edward Herron, Debra Tarry, David Baker, Jenny Anne Durkan, Carmen Best, Shawn Ledford, Brandon Moen, Rob Karlinsey, Susan H Amini, Robert W Ferguson, Jay Robert Inslee and Teresa Berntsen
Case Number: 2:2019cv02072
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Filing 8 JUDGMENT BY COURT: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B), Plaintiff's complaint and this action are DISMISSED without prejudice. (PM) cc: Plaintiff via USPS
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re Plaintiff's #6 Amended Complaint. As Plaintiff's amended complaint fails to cure the deficiencies previously identified by the Court, the Court hereby DISMISSES Plaintiff's complaint and this action without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM) cc: Plaintiff via USPS
January 10, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Susan H Amini, David Baker, Carmen Best, John Doe, Jenny Anne Durkan, Robert W Ferguson, William Hall, Edward Herron, Jay Robert Inslee, Rob Karlinsey, Margaret Jane King, Shawn Ledford, Brandon Moen, Debra Tarry, Donna Kay Tucker, Teresa Berntsen with JURY DEMAND, filed by William McKoby. (PM)
December 27, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER directing Plaintiff to file an amended complaint curing the defects identified by this order no later than 14 days from the date of this order. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM) cc: Plaintiff via first class mail
December 26, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Susan Amini, David Baker, Carmen Best, John Doe, Jenny A Durkan, Robert W Ferguson, William Hall, Edward Herron, Jay Robert Inslee, Rob Karlinsey, Margaret Jane King, Shawn Ledford, Brandon Moen, Debra Tarry, Donna Kay Tucker (Receipt # IFP Granted), filed by William McKoby. (Attachments: #1 Blank Exhibit Cover Sheet (no exhibits attached), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(PM)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Court recommends the complaint be reviewed under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) before issuance of summons. Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida.(PM) cc: Plaintiff via first class mail
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by William McKoby. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Blank Exhibit Cover Sheets (no exhibits attached), #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKoby v. Inslee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Kay Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Jane King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Herron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Tarry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenny Anne Durkan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmen Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Ledford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Moen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Karlinsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan H Amini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Robert Inslee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Berntsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William McKoby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?