Sahm v. Onslow Bay Financial LLC et al
Plaintiff: Teri K Sahm
Defendant: US Bank National Association, Onslow Bay Financial LLC, Merscorp Holding Inc, Bank of America Corporation, Ocwen Loan Servicing Inc, Annaly Capital Management Inc, MTC Financial Inc, US Bancorp, Select Portfolio Servicing Inc, Wells Fargo Bank NA, John P Wiehoff, Jacques J Busque, Karen S Lynch, Kevin Stein, Jenne K Britell, Roland A. Hernandez, Warner L Baxter, Elizabeth L Buse, Glenn A Messina, James L Chosy, Yusef I Mehdi, David B O'Maley, Olivia F Kirtley, Andrew Cecere, Alan J Bowers, Arthur D. Collins, Jr., Kimberly J Harris, O'dell Owens, Doroty Bridges, Scott W Wine, Marc N Casper, Richard P McKenney, Doreen Woo Ho, Terrence R Dolan, Phyllis R Caldwell, Craig D Schnuck and Robert J Lipstein
Case Number: 2:2019cv02090
Filed: December 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE directing Plaintiff to file a Response no later than fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Failure to file this Response will result in dismissal of this case. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM) cc: Plaintiff via USPS
February 13, 2020 Attorney Robert W Norman, Jr added for Warner L Baxter, Alan J Bowers, Doroty Bridges, Jenne K Britell, Elizabeth L Buse, Jacques J Busque, for Phyllis R Caldwell, Marc N Casper, Andrew Cecere, James L Chosy, Arthur D. Collins, Jr., Terrence R Dolan, Kimberly J Harris, Roland A. Hernandez, Doreen Woo Ho, Olivia F Kirtley, Robert J Lipstein, Karen S Lynch, Richard P McKenney, Yusef I Mehdi, Glenn A Messina, David B O'Maley, Ocwen Loan Servicing Inc, O'dell Owens, Craig D Schnuck, Kevin Stein, US Bancorp, US Bank National Association, John P Wiehoff, Scott W Wine per #8 Notice of Appearance. (PM)
February 12, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ryan S. Moore on behalf of Defendants Ocwen Loan Servicing Inc, US Bancorp, US Bank National Association, Phyllis R. Caldwell, Glen A. Messina erroneously named Glenn A. Messina, Alan J. Bowers, Jenne K. Britell, Jacques J. Busquet erroneously named Jacques J. Busque, Robert J. Lipstein, Kevin Stein, Andrew Cecere, Terrance R. Dolan erroneously named Terrence R. Dolan, James L. Chosy, Warner L. Baxter, Dorothy Bridges erroneously named Doroty Bridges, Elizabeth L. Buse, Marc N. Casper, Arthur D. Collins Jr., Kimberly J. Harris, Roland A. Hernandez, Doreen Woo Ho, Olivia F. Kirtley, Karen S. Lynch, Richard P. McKenney, Yusuf I. Mehdi erroneously named Yusef I. Mehdi, David B. OMaley, Odell Owens, M.D., M.P.H., Craig D. Schnuck, Scott W. Wine, John P. Wieh. (Moore, Ryan) Modified on 2/13/2020 to add names of defendants (PM).
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 3/16/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 3/2/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/9/2020. (cc via first class mail to pro se plaintiff) (LC)
January 24, 2020 Attorney KC Lynne Hovda for Annaly Capital Management Inc,KC Lynne Hovda for Onslow Bay Financial LLC,KC Lynne Hovda for Select Portfolio Servicing Inc added; per #6 Notice of Appearance. (TH)
January 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Donald Jeffrey Courser on behalf of Defendants Annaly Capital Management Inc, Onslow Bay Financial LLC, Select Portfolio Servicing Inc. (Courser, Donald)
January 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE to Court re Notice to Filer; filed by Plaintiff Teri K Sahm. (TH)
December 31, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Annaly Capital Management Inc, Bank of America Corporation, MTC Financial Inc, Merscorp Holding Inc, Ocwen Loan Servicing Inc, Onslow Bay Financial LLC, Select Portfolio Servicing Inc, US Bancorp, US Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank NA (Receipt # IFP Granted), filed by Teri K Sahm. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 White Binder Exhibits 1 to 2, #3 SEALED White Binder Exhibits 3 to 5, #4 SEALED White Binder Exhibits 6 to 9, #5 SEALED Blue Binder Exhibits 1 to 3, #6 SEALED Blue Binder Exhibits Unnumbered)(PM)(Exhibits sealed due to sensitive personal identifiers)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (PM) cc: Plaintiff via USPS
December 30, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Exhibit(s) contain personal identifiers that must be redacted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2 and Local Civil Rule 5.2. Please note that social security numbers and taxpayer-identification numbers must be redacted in their entirety and financial accounting information must be redacted to the last four digits (see LCR 5.2). Please file a redacted version of the documents as soon as practicable. This will not affect your original filing date. Pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LCR 5.2, the document(s) have been administratively sealed by the Court. cc plaintiff via USPS (KB)
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. CC to plaintiff via US Mail. (GT)
December 27, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Brian A Tsuchida, filed by Teri K Sahm. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 White Binder Exhibits 1 to 2, SEALED DOCUMENT #4 White Binder Exhibits 3 to 5, SEALED DOCUMENT #5 White Binder Exhibits 6 to 9, SEALED DOCUMENT #6 Blue Binder Exhibits 1 to 3, SEALED DOCUMENT #7 Blue Binder Exhibits Unnumbered)(GT) Modified on 12/30/2019 to seal documents 1-4, 1-5, 1-6, and 1-7: documents contain personal identifiers; sealed pursuant to FRCP and LCR 5.2 (KB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sahm v. Onslow Bay Financial LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank National Association
Represented By: Ryan S. Moore
Represented By: Robert W Norman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Onslow Bay Financial LLC
Represented By: KC Lynne Hovda
Represented By: Donald Jeffrey Courser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merscorp Holding Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing Inc
Represented By: Ryan S. Moore
Represented By: Robert W Norman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annaly Capital Management Inc
Represented By: KC Lynne Hovda
Represented By: Donald Jeffrey Courser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTC Financial Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bancorp
Represented By: Ryan S. Moore
Represented By: Robert W Norman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing Inc
Represented By: KC Lynne Hovda
Represented By: Donald Jeffrey Courser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John P Wiehoff
Represented By: Ryan S. Moore
Represented By: Robert W Norman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacques J Busque
Represented By: Ryan S. Moore
Represented By: Robert W Norman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen S Lynch
Represented By: Ryan S. Moore
Represented By: Robert W Norman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Stein
Represented By: Ryan S. Moore
Represented By: Robert W Norman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenne K Britell
Represented By: Ryan S. Moore
Represented By: Robert W Norman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roland A. Hernandez
Represented By: Ryan S. Moore
Represented By: Robert W Norman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner L Baxter
Represented By: Ryan S. Moore
Represented By: Robert W Norman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth L Buse
Represented By: Ryan S. Moore
Represented By: Robert W Norman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn A Messina
Represented By: Ryan S. Moore
Represented By: Robert W Norman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L Chosy
Represented By: Ryan S. Moore
Represented By: Robert W Norman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yusef I Mehdi
Represented By: Ryan S. Moore
Represented By: Robert W Norman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David B O'Maley
Represented By: Ryan S. Moore
Represented By: Robert W Norman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olivia F Kirtley
Represented By: Ryan S. Moore
Represented By: Robert W Norman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Cecere
Represented By: Ryan S. Moore
Represented By: Robert W Norman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan J Bowers
Represented By: Ryan S. Moore
Represented By: Robert W Norman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur D. Collins, Jr.
Represented By: Ryan S. Moore
Represented By: Robert W Norman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly J Harris
Represented By: Ryan S. Moore
Represented By: Robert W Norman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'dell Owens
Represented By: Ryan S. Moore
Represented By: Robert W Norman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doroty Bridges
Represented By: Ryan S. Moore
Represented By: Robert W Norman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott W Wine
Represented By: Ryan S. Moore
Represented By: Robert W Norman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc N Casper
Represented By: Ryan S. Moore
Represented By: Robert W Norman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard P McKenney
Represented By: Ryan S. Moore
Represented By: Robert W Norman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doreen Woo Ho
Represented By: Ryan S. Moore
Represented By: Robert W Norman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrence R Dolan
Represented By: Ryan S. Moore
Represented By: Robert W Norman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phyllis R Caldwell
Represented By: Ryan S. Moore
Represented By: Robert W Norman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig D Schnuck
Represented By: Ryan S. Moore
Represented By: Robert W Norman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J Lipstein
Represented By: Ryan S. Moore
Represented By: Robert W Norman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teri K Sahm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?