Cortez v. Wolf et al
Plaintiff: Juan Rocha Cortez
Defendant: Warden of the Northwest Immigration Detention Center, Chad Wolf, Elizabeth Godfrey, Steven Langford, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Anne Arries Corsano, Donald Neufeld, Laura B Zuchowski, Cynthia Munita and Warden
Case Number: 2:2019cv02091
Filed: December 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated. Pursuant to the parties' #5 Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss, this case is dismissed with prejudice and without costs or fees to any party. (VE)
February 7, 2020 Filing 5 Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss and Proposed Order, filed by Plaintiff Juan Rocha Cortez. Noting Date 2/7/2020, (Korthuis, Aaron)
February 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michelle R. Lambert on behalf of Defendants Anne Arries Corsano, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Elizabeth Godfrey, Cynthia Munita, Donald Neufeld, Chad Wolf, Laura B Zuchowski. (Lambert, Michelle)
December 30, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants Anne Arries Corsano, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Elizabeth Godfrey, Steven Langford, Cynthia Munita, Donald Neufeld, Warden of the Northwest Immigration Detention Center, Chad Wolf, and Laura B Zuchowski. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(GT)
December 30, 2019 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (GT)
December 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-6065864), filed by Juan Rocha Cortez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Chad Wolf, #3 Summons Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, #4 Summons Donald Neufeld, #5 Summons Laura B. Zuchowski, #6 Summons Anne Arries Corsano, #7 Summons Cynthia Munita, #8 Summons Elizabeth Godfrey, #9 Summons Steven Langford, #10 Summons Warden of the Northwest Immigration Detention Center, #11 Summons United States Attorney's Office)(Adams, Matt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cortez v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Rocha Cortez
Represented By: Matt Adams
Represented By: Aaron Korthuis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden of the Northwest Immigration Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Godfrey
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T Cuccinelli
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Arries Corsano
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Neufeld
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura B Zuchowski
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Munita
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?