In re: Mark Wheeler
Defendant: Mark Wheeler
Case Number: 2:2019rd00048
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Walter T McGovern
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (DS)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER VACATING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, the Court learned that Mark Wheeler is deceased, by Judge Walter T. McGovern. Order e-mailed to Clerk of US District Court, EDWA, Clerk of US Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Clerk of US Bankruptcy Court, WDWA and WSBA. Changed admission status in ECF to deceased. (DS)
June 19, 2019 Verified with Washington State Bar Association, bar status has been changed to deceased. (DS)
June 19, 2019 Received phone call informing that attorney died last year. (DS)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Walter T. McGovern. Show Cause Response due by 7/15/2019. Mailed Order to addresses on docket. (DS)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Suspension from the Supreme Court of Washington, Order No. 201,854-8, Administrative Suspension of Attorneys for Failure to Comply with 2019 Licensing Requirements.(DS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Mark Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Wheeler
Represented By: Mark A. Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?