In re: John C Bolliger
In Re: John Cameron Bolliger
Case Number: 2:2019rd00068
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Walter T McGovern
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. re #4 Order of Reciprocal Discipline, (DS)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of Reciprocal Discipline suspending John C Bolliger from the practice of law before this Court by Judge Walter T. McGovern. Order e-mailed to Clerk of US District Court, EDWA, Clerk of US Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Clerk of US Bankruptcy Court, WDWA and WSBA. Mailed Order to Addresses on Docket. (DS) Modified on 9/3/2019 (DS).
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Walter T. McGovern. Show Cause Response due by 8/19/2019. Mailed Order to addresses on docket.(DS)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Suspension from the Washington State Bar Association, Proceeding No. 16#00108 re #1 Notice-Other, suspending John C Bolliger for 36 Months. (DS)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE from the Supreme Court of Washington, Order No. 201,865-3, Order Imposing 36 Month Suspension. (DS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: John C Bolliger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: John Cameron Bolliger
Represented By: John C Bolliger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?