Rische v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Alan Rische
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2020cv00033
Filed: January 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Alexander Stevko on behalf of Defendant United States of America. (Stevko, Alexander)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida, re #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. United States of America answer due 4/21/2020. (AQ)
February 26, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , filed by Defendant United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/26/2020, (Stevko, Alexander)
January 21, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to U.S. Attorney General on 1/17/2020, filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey Alan Rische. (Rische, Jeffrey)
January 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE: Plaintiff Jeffrey Alan Rische has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (PS)
January 8, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued in Paper Form as to defendants United States of America. Sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (GT)
January 8, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. cc to plaintiff via US Mail. (GT)
January 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant United States of America with JURY DEMAND(Receipt # SEA099439), filed by Jeffrey Alan Rische. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Email transmittal)(GT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rische v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Alan Rische
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Rische
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Alexander Stevko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?