SA Music LLC et al v. Amazon.com Inc et al
Plaintiff: SA Music, LLC and William Kolbert, as Trustee of the Harold Arlen Trust
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc., Lenandes Ltd, Amazon Digital Services LLC, Limitless Int., Giacomo Verani and Valley Arm Digital Limited
Case Number: 2:2020cv00105
Filed: January 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 20-cv-00106-MLP; 20-cv-00107-BJR, by Plaintiffs William Kolbert, SA Music LLC. (Mann, Philip)
February 13, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Amazon Digital Services LLC mailed on 2/7/2020 (Mann, Philip)
February 13, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Amazon.com Inc mailed on 2/7/2020 (Mann, Philip)
February 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Philip P Mann. Filed by Plaintiffs William Kolbert, SA Music LLC. (Mann, Philip)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Matthew F Schwartz for William Kolbert and SA Music LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
February 5, 2020 Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Matthew F. Schwartz FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs William Kolbert, SA Music LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6127515 (Mann, Philip)
January 31, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by SA Music LLC (Mann, Philip)
January 24, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendants Amazon Digital Services LLC, Amazon.com Inc, Lenandes Ltd, Limitless Int Recordings, Valley Arm Digital Limited, and Giacomo Verani. (GT)
January 24, 2020 Filing 2 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office. (GT)
January 24, 2020 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, SA Music LLC must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 1/31/2020. (GT)
January 24, 2020 Judge J Richard Creatura added. (GT)
January 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-6096255) Attorney Philip P Mann added to party William Kolbert, as Trustee of the Harold Arlen Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Philip P Mann added to party SA Music, LLC(pty:pla), filed by SA Music, LLC, William Kolbert, as Trustee of the Harold Arlen Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Report on Copyrights (AO Form 121))(Mann, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SA Music LLC et al v. Amazon.com Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenandes Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Digital Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Limitless Int.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giacomo Verani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley Arm Digital Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SA Music, LLC
Represented By: Philip P Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Kolbert, as Trustee of the Harold Arlen Trust
Represented By: Philip P Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?