Four Jays Music Company et al v. Amazon.com Inc et al
Plaintiff: Julia Riva and Four Jays Music Company
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc., Limitless Int. Recordings, Lenandes Ltd, Amazon Digital Services LLC, Giacomo Verani and Valley Arm Digital Limited
Case Number: 2:2020cv00107
Filed: January 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 4/3/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 3/20/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/27/2020, by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (LW)
February 18, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 20-cv-00105-JRC; 20-cv-00106-MLP, by Plaintiffs Four Jays Music Company, Julia Riva. (Mann, Philip)
February 13, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Amazon Digital Services LLC mailed on 2/7/2020 (Mann, Philip)
February 13, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Amazon.com Inc mailed on 2/7/2020 (Mann, Philip)
February 13, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Philip P Mann. Filed by Plaintiffs Four Jays Music Company, Julia Riva. (Mann, Philip)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Oren S Giskan for Four Jays Music Company and Julia Riva, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
February 5, 2020 Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Oren Giskan FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Four Jays Music Company, Julia Riva (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6127538 (Mann, Philip)
January 31, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Four Jays Music Company (Mann, Philip)
January 24, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendants Amazon Digital Services LLC, Amazon.com Inc, Lenandes Ltd, Limitless Int Recordings, Valley Arm Digital Limited, and Giacomo Verani. (GT)
January 24, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office. (GT)
January 24, 2020 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Four Jays Music Company must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 1/31/2020. (GT)
January 24, 2020 Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (GT)
January 23, 2020 Filing 2 PRAECIPE re #1 Complaint, (to Correct Caption) by Plaintiffs Four Jays Music Company, Julia Riva (Mann, Philip)
January 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-6096484) Attorney Philip P Mann added to party Four Jays Music Company(pty:pla), Attorney Philip P Mann added to party Julia Riva(pty:pla), filed by Four Jays Music Company, Julia Riva. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Report on Copyrights (AO Form 121))(Mann, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Four Jays Music Company et al v. Amazon.com Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Limitless Int. Recordings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenandes Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Digital Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giacomo Verani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley Arm Digital Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Riva
Represented By: Philip P Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Four Jays Music Company
Represented By: Philip P Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?