Sherlock Investments-Duvall LLC v. Intercoastal Auto Brokers and Logistics, LLC et al
Plaintiff: John and Jane Does 1-10, Sherlock Investments-Duvall, LLC and Sherlock Investments-Duvall LLC
Defendant: Bank of America, NA, Vivian F. Windross Charitable Remainder Unitrust, Jane Doe Dixon, Jane Doe Windross, John and Jane 2-10 Doe, QAE Insurance Brokerage, Inc., Bank of America NA, Donald Dixon, Intercoastal Auto Brokers & Logistics, LLC and Kencle Windross
Case Number: 2:2020cv00129
Filed: January 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Referring Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant Bank of America NA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/3/2020, (Oates, Daniel)
February 27, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE to Withdraw Pending Motion re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ; by Defendant Bank of America NA. (Oates, Daniel)
February 27, 2020 Filing 20 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Donald Dixon, Jane Doe Dixon, Intercoastal Auto Brokers & Logistics, LLC, QAE Insurance Brokerage, Inc., Vivian F. Windross Charitable Remainder Unitrust, Jane Doe Windross, Kencle Windross (MW)
February 26, 2020 Filing 19 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Sherlock Investments-Duvall LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Clausen, Mark)
February 26, 2020 Filing 18 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Sherlock Investments-Duvall LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Clausen, Mark)
February 26, 2020 Filing 17 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Sherlock Investments-Duvall LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Clausen, Mark)
February 26, 2020 Filing 16 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Sherlock Investments-Duvall LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Clausen, Mark)
February 26, 2020 Filing 15 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Sherlock Investments-Duvall LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Clausen, Mark)
February 26, 2020 Filing 14 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Sherlock Investments-Duvall LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Clausen, Mark)
February 26, 2020 Filing 13 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #12 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Sherlock Investments-Duvall LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Clausen, Mark)
February 24, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Sherlock Investments-Duvall LLC.(Clausen, Mark)
February 24, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Sherlock Investments-Duvall LLC, to #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Clausen, Mark)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 3/11/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/25/2020, Joint Status Report due by 4/8/2020. (TF)
February 4, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Sherlock Investments-Duvall LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Clausen, Mark)
February 3, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant Bank of America NA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/28/2020, (Oates, Daniel)
February 3, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk William M McCool. Case reassigned to Judge Richard A. Jones and referred to Hon. Brian A. Tsuchida pursuant to Local Rule MJR 6 and General Order 02-19. (AQ)
January 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 2/4/2020. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (TF)
January 28, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Defendant Bank of America NA. (Oates, Daniel)
January 28, 2020 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Sherlock Investments-Duvall LLC must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 2/4/2020. (GT)
January 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (GT)
January 28, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GT)
January 28, 2020 Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (GT)
January 27, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent BANA Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company for Bank of America, NA. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Bank of America, NA (Loberstein, Katie)
January 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 19-2-34041-0-SEA; (Receipt # AWAWDC-6103608), filed by Bank of America, NA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit State Court Pleadings)(Loberstein, Katie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sherlock Investments-Duvall LLC v. Intercoastal Auto Brokers and Logistics, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, NA
Represented By: Daniel J. Oates
Represented By: Katie Loberstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivian F. Windross Charitable Remainder Unitrust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Windross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane 2-10 Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QAE Insurance Brokerage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America NA
Represented By: Daniel J. Oates
Represented By: Katie Loberstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intercoastal Auto Brokers & Logistics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kencle Windross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John and Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherlock Investments-Duvall, LLC
Represented By: Mark A Clausen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherlock Investments-Duvall LLC
Represented By: Mark A Clausen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?