Sherman v. State of Washington et al
Plaintiff: Andrian Sherman and Andrian D Sherman
Defendant: Byron Ward, State of Washington, Catherine Marie McDowal, Steven Hobbs and Alice Mary Zaleski
Case Number: 2:2020cv00191
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER dismissing Plaintiff's #4 complaint for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted and for seeking monetary damages against immune defendants. Plaintiff's claims against Steven Hobbs and and Catherine Marie McDowal are dismissed with prejudice and without leave to amend. The remainder of Mr. Sherman's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff has 20 days from this order to file an amended complaint to cure deficiencies. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
March 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE: Plaintiff Andrian Sherman has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (PS)
March 12, 2020 Filing 5 Mail addressed to Andrian Sherman returned as Undeliverable re #3 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, (TH)
February 10, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Steven Hobbs, Catherine Marie McDowal, State of Washington, Byron Ward, Alice Mary Zaleski with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # IFP Granted), filed by Andrian Sherman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (PM)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Court recommends the complaint be reviewed under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) before issuance of summons. Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida.(PM) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS) Modified on 3/16/2020 to resend copy to correct address (TH).
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Andrian Sherman. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sherman v. State of Washington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byron Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Marie McDowal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alice Mary Zaleski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrian Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrian D Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?