Killam v. Benoliel
Plaintiff: Adrianna Killam
Defendant: David Benoliel
Case Number: 2:2020cv00502
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 6/2/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 5/12/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/26/2020. (AD)
April 24, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by David Benoliel.(Rullman, Charles)
April 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Charles P Rullman, III on behalf of Defendant David Benoliel. (Rullman, Charles)
April 3, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) David Benoliel (SG)
April 3, 2020 Judge James L. Robart added. (SG)
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) David Benoliel with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6249480), filed by Adrianna Killam. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Fong, Bonnie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Killam v. Benoliel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrianna Killam
Represented By: Bonnie Nobuko Fong
Represented By: Conrad Reynoldson
Represented By: Bonnie Fong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Benoliel
Represented By: Charles P Rullman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?