Kertis v. Sterling et al
Plaintiff: Bradley Kertis
Defendant: Scott A Sterling, Matrix Services, Inc., Equilon Enterprises LLC, Jane Doe Sterling and Matrix Service Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv00526
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 Filing 27 DECLARATION of Jonathan Missen filed by Defendant Equilon Enterprises LLC re #17 MOTION to Amend Complaint (Missen, Jonathan)
June 1, 2020 Filing 26 RESPONSE, by Defendant Equilon Enterprises LLC, to #17 MOTION to Amend Complaint. (Missen, Jonathan)
May 29, 2020 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Sean B. Malcolm filed by Plaintiff Bradley Kertis re #16 MOTION to Remand (Malcolm, Sean)
May 29, 2020 Filing 24 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Bradley Kertis, TO RESPONSE to #16 MOTION to Remand (Malcolm, Sean)
May 29, 2020 Filing 23 REPLY, filed by Defendant Equilon Enterprises LLC, TO RESPONSE to #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Missen, Jonathan)
May 28, 2020 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Scott and Jane Doe Sterling on 5/27/2020, filed by Plaintiff Bradley Kertis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Malcolm, Sean)
May 22, 2020 Filing 21 CROSS-MOTION AND RESPONSE re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ., filed by Plaintiff Bradley Kertis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/5/2020, (Malcolm, Sean)
May 22, 2020 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Matthew R. Wojcik filed by Defendants Equilon Enterprises LLC, Matrix Service Inc re #16 MOTION to Remand (Wojcik, Matthew)
May 22, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE, by Defendants Equilon Enterprises LLC, Matrix Service Inc, to #16 MOTION to Remand . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wojcik, Matthew)
May 19, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion to Amend subject to Motion to Remand re #17 MOTION to Amend Complaint, #16 MOTION to Remand ; filed by Plaintiff Bradley Kertis. (Malcolm, Sean)
May 19, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Amend Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Bradley Kertis. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/5/2020, (Malcolm, Sean)
May 6, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Remand , filed by Plaintiff Bradley Kertis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/29/2020, (Malcolm, Sean)
May 6, 2020 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Scott and Jane Doe Sterling on 3/10/2020, filed by Plaintiff Bradley Kertis. (Malcolm, Sean)
May 6, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Matrix Service, Inc. on 3/6/2020, filed by Plaintiff Bradley Kertis. (Malcolm, Sean)
May 6, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Equilon Enterprises LLC on 3/6/2020, filed by Plaintiff Bradley Kertis. (Malcolm, Sean)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 6/16/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 6/2/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/9/2020, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (LW)
April 30, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Matrix Service Company for Matrix Service Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Matrix Service Inc (Wojcik, Matthew)
April 30, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ; filed by Defendant Equilon Enterprises LLC. (Missen, Jonathan)
April 30, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant Equilon Enterprises LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Dismiss) Noting Date 5/29/2020, (Missen, Jonathan)
April 30, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Equilon Enterprises LLC (Missen, Jonathan)
April 15, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint; by Matrix Service Inc.(Wojcik, Matthew)
April 9, 2020 Reset Deadlines: At defense counsel's request, Corporate Disclosure deadline extended 2 weeks to 4/30/2020. (LW)
April 8, 2020 Filing 6 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Bradley Kertis (Malcolm, Sean)
April 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sean Bennet Malcolm on behalf of Plaintiff Bradley Kertis. (Malcolm, Sean)
April 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (CDA)
April 7, 2020 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, that Equilon Enterprises LLC and Matrix Service Inc must file Corporate Disclosure Statements by 4/14/2020. (CDA)
April 7, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (CDA)
April 7, 2020 Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (CDA)
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Joinder JOINING #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Matrix Services, Inc.. (Wojcik, Matthew)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 20-2-05630-8; (Receipt # AWAWDC-6255401), filed by Equilon Enterprises LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 and 2, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jaeger, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/7/2020: #3 State Court Complaint) (CDA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kertis v. Sterling et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott A Sterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matrix Services, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew R Wojcik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equilon Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Michael Anthony Jaeger
Represented By: Jonathan R Missen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Sterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matrix Service Inc
Represented By: Matthew R Wojcik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Kertis
Represented By: Sean Bennet Malcolm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?