SA Music LLC et al v. Amazon.com Inc et al
Plaintiff: SA Music LLC, Ray Henderson Music Co Inc, Four Jays Music Company and Julia Riva
Defendant: Pickwick International Limited, Mastercorp Pty. Ltd., Pickwick Group Limited, Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com Inc and Pickwick Australia Pty Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00579
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to the Standing Order for Civil Cases Setting Trial Date, Related Dates, and Court Procedures ("Standing Order") [Dkt. No. #14 ], the Court HEREBY STRIKES the noting date for Motion for Order Directing Foreign Service [Dkt. No. #23 ]. Instead, pursuant to Section II.A. 3 of the Standing Order, the opposition to the motion is due twenty-one (21) days after the date on which the motion was filed and the reply is due fourteen (14) days after the opposition is filed. This Minute Order does not strike the motion; rather, it strikes the noting date. The Court will consider the motion upon the completion of briefing in accordance with the foregoing schedule. In the future, the Court expects the parties to comply with the terms of the Standing Order. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (TH)
June 11, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION Order Directing Foreign Service on Defendants Pickwick International Limited, Pickwick Group Limited, Pickwick Australia Pty Ltd., and Mastercorp Pty. Ltd., filed by Plaintiffs Four Jays Music Company, William Kolbert, Ray Henderson Music Co Inc, Julia Riva, SA Music LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Declaration of Matthew F. Schwartz, #2 Exhibit 1 - Pickwick Group Limited Companies House Filing, #3 Exhibit 2 - Pickwick Contact Page, #4 Exhibit 3 - Pickwick Int'l Limited Companies House Filing, #5 Exhibit 4 - Pickwick Australia Pty Ltd ASIC Filing, #6 Exhibit 5 - Mastercorp Pty Ltd ASIC Filing, #7 Exhibit 6 - Queensland Civil and Administrative Tribunal web page, #8 Exhibit 7 - Australia Service and Execution of Process Act 1992, #9 Exhibit 8 - Office of Parliamentary Counsel web page, #10 Exhibit 9 - Queensland Uniform Civil Procedure Rules 1999, #11 Exhibit 10 - Australia Corporations Act 2001, #12 Exhibit 11 - Queensland Civil and Administrative Tribunal Rules 2009, #13 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/11/2020, (Schwartz, Matthew) Modified on 6/12/2020 to strike noting date (TH).
May 29, 2020 Attorney Eric J Weiss,David T. Martin for Amazon.com Inc and Amazon.com Services LLC added; per #15 Notice of Appearance. (TH)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re #18 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney David Mattern for Defendants Amazon.com Inc and Amazon.com Services LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re #17 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jason Blake Cunningham for Defendants Amazon.com Inc, and Amazon.com Services LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re #16 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kenneth L Steinthal for Defendants Amazon.com Inc and Amazon.com Services LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
May 29, 2020 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC (Simpkins, Holly)
May 29, 2020 Filing 18 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY David Mattern FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6368685 (Simpkins, Holly)
May 29, 2020 Filing 17 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jason Blake Cunningham FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6368677 (Simpkins, Holly)
May 29, 2020 Filing 16 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kenneth Steinthal FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6368672 (Simpkins, Holly)
May 29, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Holly Marie Simpkins on behalf of Defendants Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC. (Simpkins, Holly)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (LW)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 7/7/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 6/23/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/30/2020, by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (LW)
May 14, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #6 Waiver of Service, #5 Waiver of Service : corrected date Waivers were mailed to Amazon.com Inc. and Amazon.com Services LLC from 5/7/2020 to 4/27/2020. (PM)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Oren S Giskan for Plaintiffs Four Jays Music Company, William Kolbert, Ray Henderson Music Co Inc, Julia Riva, and SA Music LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Brian Levenson Plaintiffs Four Jays Music Company, William Kolbert, Ray Henderson Music Co Inc, Julia Riva, and SA Music LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Matthew F Schwartz for Plaintiffs Four Jays Music Company, William Kolbert, Ray Henderson Music Co Inc, Julia Riva, and SA Music LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
May 14, 2020 Filing 9 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Oren Giskan FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Four Jay Music Company, Ray Henderson Music Co Inc, Julia Riva, SA Music LLC, and William Kolbert (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6336041 (Mann, Philip) Modified to include all Plaintiffs on 5/14/2020 (DS).
May 14, 2020 Filing 8 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Brian S. Levenson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Four Jay Music Company, Ray Henderson Music Co Inc, Julia Riva, SA Music LLC, and William Kolbert (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6336038 (Mann, Philip) Modified to include all Plaintiffs on 5/14/2020 (DS).
May 14, 2020 Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Matthew F. Schwartz FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Four Jay Music Company, Ray Henderson Music Co Inc, Julia Riva, SA Music LLC, and William Kolbert (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6336035 (Mann, Philip) Modified to include all Plaintiffs on 5/14/2020 (DS).
May 13, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Amazon.com Services LLC mailed on 5/7/2020 4/27/2020 (Mann, Philip) Modified on 5/14/2020 to correct date Waiver was mailed to Amazon.com Services, Inc. (Kenneth L. Steinthal) (PM).
May 13, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Amazon.com Inc mailed on 5/7/2020 4/27/2020 (Mann, Philip) Modified on 5/14/2020 to correct date waiver was mailed to Amazon.com Inc (Kenneth L. Steinthal) (PM).
April 17, 2020 Filing 4 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) All Defendants (SG)
April 17, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office (SG)
April 17, 2020 Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (SG)
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Four Jays Music Company, Ray Henderson Music Co Inc, SA Music LLC (Mann, Philip)
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Copyright Infringement against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6276651) Attorney Philip P Mann added to party Four Jays Music Company(pty:pla), Attorney Philip P Mann added to party Ray Henderson Music Co Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Philip P Mann added to party Julia Riva(pty:pla), Attorney Philip P Mann added to party SA Music LLC(pty:pla), filed by Four Jays Music Company, Ray Henderson Music Co Inc, Julia Riva, SA Music LLC, and William Kolbert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons, #7 Report on Copyrights (AO Form 121))(Mann, Philip) Modified on 4/20/2020 to add Plaintiff William Kolbert as a filer (KB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SA Music LLC et al v. Amazon.com Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pickwick International Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mastercorp Pty. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pickwick Group Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pickwick Australia Pty Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SA Music LLC
Represented By: Philip P Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Henderson Music Co Inc
Represented By: Philip P Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Four Jays Music Company
Represented By: Philip P Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Riva
Represented By: Philip P Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?