Nguyen et al v. Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: JENNIFER B NGUYEN
Defendant: Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America
Consolidated Plaintiff: Jeffrey E Kashner, Sunseet S Bath DDS PS individually and on behalf of others similarly situated doing business as Impressions Dentistry Family Cosmetics, DDS Khuzi Hsue, Ryan M Fox and Stan's Bar-B-Q LLC
Consolidated Defendant: The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Co and Travelers Indemnity Company of America
Interested Party: The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00597
Filed: April 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Referring Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MINUTE ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the parties' Stipulated Motion re Proposed Schedule for Amended Complaints and Briefing of Dispositive Motions. Dkt. No. #47 . The Court hereby GRANTS the motion and sets the following schedule: production of certified copies of policies are due no later than November 24, 2020; amended complaints are due no later than November 25, 2020; Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs' complaints through motion no later than January 15, 2021; Plaintiffs shall respond to the motions no later than February 12, 2021; and Defendants shall reply in support of their motions no later than March 5, 2021. Page limits for the briefing shall be in accordance with LCR 7(e)(3), providing 24 pages for dispositive motions and oppositions and 12 pages for replies. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein.(MW)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the Standing Order for Civil Cases Setting Trial Date, Related Dates, and Court Procedures (Standing Order) (Dkt. No. #26 ), the Court HEREBY STRIKES the noting date for the parties stipulated motion (Dkt. No. #47 ). This Minute Order does not strike the stipulated motion; rather, it strikes the noting date. The Court considers the stipulated motion upon filing. In the future, the Court expects the parties to comply with the terms of the Standing Order. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (PM)
November 23, 2020 Filing 47 Stipulated MOTION re Proposed Schedule for Amended Complaints and Briefing of Dispositive Motions, filed by Interested Party The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company. Noting Date 11/23/2020, (Morrison, James)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 SCHEDULING ORDER: The attorneys in this case shall consult with the attorneys in the other business insurance cases so as to prepare a briefing schedule to address common questions of coverage and exclusions and the filing of amended complaints, if required. In determining such a schedule, the attorneys shall ensure that briefing on any future dispositive motions is ripe for Court review at the same time and shall seek to avoid duplication wherever possible. All discovery in this case is stayed until such time as the Court rules on the motions. The Parties shall inform the Court as to their proposed schedule no later than Monday, November 23, 2020. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (MW)
November 6, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE of Filing Defendants' Status Report Re Question Raised in the Courts First Scheduling Order ; filed by Consol Defendants The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Co, Travelers Indemnity Company of America, Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Bentson, Daniel)
November 6, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, filed by Consol Defendants The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Co, Travelers Indemnity Company of America, Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Proposed Order)(Bentson, Daniel)
November 5, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #41 Notice-Other, #42 Notice-Other, #40 Notice-Other : Struck per counsel request, filed in error. (STP)
November 5, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Filing of Plaintiffs' Statement in Response to First Scheduling Order re #28 Scheduling Order, ; filed by Consol Plaintiffs Sunseet S Bath, Ryan M Fox, Khuzi Hsue, Jeffrey E Kashner, Stan's Bar-B-Q LLC, Plaintiff Jennifer B Nguyen. (Williams-Derry, Amy)
November 5, 2020 Filing 42 DISREGARD NOTICE of Filing of Plaintiffs' Statement in Response to First Scheduling Order re #28 Scheduling Order, ; filed by Consol Plaintiffs Sunseet S Bath, Ryan M Fox, Khuzi Hsue, Jeffrey E Kashner, Stan's Bar-B-Q LLC. (Williams-Derry, Amy) Modified on 11/5/2020 per counsel, filed in error (STP).
November 5, 2020 Filing 41 DISREGARD filed in error NOTICE of Filing of Plaintiffs' Statement in Response to First Scheduling Order re #28 Scheduling Order, ; filed by Consol Plaintiffs Ryan M Fox, Khuzi Hsue, Jeffrey E Kashner, Stan's Bar-B-Q LLC, Plaintiff Jennifer B Nguyen. (Williams-Derry, Amy) Modified on 11/5/2020 per counsel, filed in error (STP).
November 4, 2020 Filing 40 DISREGARD Filed in error NOTICE of Filing of Plaintiffs' Statement in Response to First Scheduling Order re #28 Scheduling Order, ; filed by Plaintiff Jennifer B Nguyen. (Williams-Derry, Amy) Modified on 11/5/2020 per counsel filed in error (STP).
November 3, 2020 Filing 39 MINUTE ENTRY: Please be advised that a new case has been added to the list of related cases to be discussed during the November 9 case management conference. See Seattle Bakery LLC et al v. Sentinel Insurance Company Ltd, 20-cv-1540-BJR. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (MW)
October 27, 2020 Filing 38 MINUTE ENTRY: Please be advised that a new case has been added to the list of related cases to be discussed during the November 9 case management conference. See Worthy Hotels Inc et al v. Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, 20-cv-01515-BJR. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (MW)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTE ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the parties' correspondence regarding the Court's First Scheduling Order. The Court hereby schedules a case management conference to be conducted on November 9, 2020 at 1:00 pm Pacific via Zoom. Technical details for the Zoom conference to follow. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (MW)
October 19, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Owen R Mooney for Consol Defendants The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Co, Travelers Indemnity Company of America, Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Mooney, Owen)
October 16, 2020 Filing 35 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America with JURY DEMAND, filed by Stan's Bar-B-Q LLC, Khuzi Hsue, Sunseet S Bath, Ryan M Fox, Jennifer B Nguyen, Jeffrey E Kashner.(Williams-Derry, Amy)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER: The Court notes the parties' Notice of Stipulation Filed Extending Time to Respond to Motion to Consolidate. Dkt. No. #32 . The Court has granted the motion as filed in the related case Marler v. Aspen American Insurance Company 20-cv-00616. Defendants' response to the motion to consolidate shall be due no later than October 21, 2020 and Plaintiffs' reply in support shall be due no later than 14 days from the date Defendants file their response. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (MW)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re Consolidation and Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint re: Bath v. Travelers, No 3:20-05489-BJR, Fox v.Travelers, No. 2:20-cv-00598-BJR, Hsue v. Travelers, 2:20-00622-BJR, Kashner v.Travelers, No, 2:20-cv-00625-BJR, Nguyen v. Travelers, No. 2:20-00597-BJR, and Stan's Bar-B-Q v. Charter Oak, 2:20-00613-BJR. Plaintiffs may file a consolidated amended complaint by October 16, 2020 in Nguyen v. Travelers, No. 2:20-00597-BJR, which is the lowest-captioned action listed above. The consolidated amended complaint will bear the caption Jennifer B. Nguyen, et al. v. Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, et al. Defendant may answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's amended complaint on or before November 6, 2020. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (MW)
October 14, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Stipulation Filed Extending Time to Respond to Motion to Consolidate re #27 Notice-Other ; filed by Plaintiff Jennifer B Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Marler Stipulation)(Swope, Karin)
October 14, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Filing ; filed by Plaintiff Jennifer B Nguyen. (Williams-Derry, Amy)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER: Please be advised that an additional case has been added to the list of related COVID-19 Business Insurance cases assigned to the undersigned. See Seattle Gymnastics Academy Inc. v. Sentinel Insurance Company Ltd. (20-cv-00884). Please see the attached updated list of all relevant cases. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (TH)
October 2, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Order Denying Transfer re MDL No. 2965, IN RE: Travelers COVID-19 Business Interruption Protection Insurance Litigation. (PM)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 FIRST SCHEDULING ORDER. The Court orders that counsels' meet and confer take place within the next two weeks, reporting back to the Court no later than October 20, 2020 as to counsels' readiness to meet with the Court. At that time counsel shall jointly suggest to the Court several dates and times convenient for them to meet with the Court. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (TH)
September 25, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Filing Motion to Consolidate Washington Covid-19 Closure Class Action Lawsuits ; filed by Plaintiff Jennifer B Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Consolidate, #2 Williams-Derry Declaration)(Swope, Karin)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Barbara J. Rothstein for all further proceedings. Judge Ricardo S. Martinez no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO #20 MOTION TO DISMISS re Parties' #22 Stipulation. Plaintiff's response due no later than 14 days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation issues an Order on its Order to Show Cause. Defendant's reply brief due no later than 14 days after Plaintiff files his response brief. The Motion to Dismiss #20 , currently noted for October 2, shall be noted for consideration on the date that Defendant files its reply brief. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez (PM).
September 11, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE to Withdraw Pending Motion re #18 MOTION to Stay Pending Ruling on JPML Order to Show Cause re Transfer and Consolidation or Coordination of Travelers Cases ; by Plaintiff Jennifer B Nguyen. (Birk, Ian)
September 11, 2020 Filing 22 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss by parties re #20 MOTION to Dismiss The Amended Complaint (Swope, Karin)
September 11, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Karin Bornstein Swope on behalf of Plaintiff Jennifer B Nguyen. (Swope, Karin)
September 9, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss The Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibits B-G) Noting Date 10/2/2020, (Bentson, Daniel)
September 8, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE, by Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, to #18 MOTION to Stay Pending Ruling on JPML Order to Show Cause re Transfer and Consolidation or Coordination of Travelers Cases. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bentson, Daniel)
August 27, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Stay Pending Ruling on JPML Order to Show Cause re Transfer and Consolidation or Coordination of Travelers Cases, filed by Plaintiff Jennifer B Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Ian S. Birk, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/11/2020, (Birk, Ian)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #16 Unopposed Motion for Stay of Proceedings Pending Ruling on Consolidation and Transfer by JPML. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
June 9, 2020 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION to Stay , filed by Plaintiff Jennifer B Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/9/2020, (Birk, Ian)
June 3, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America with JURY DEMAND, filed by Jennifer B Nguyen.(Birk, Ian)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re parties' #13 Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall have until June 30, 2020 to file an Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
May 22, 2020 Filing 13 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint, filed by Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. Noting Date 5/22/2020, (Bentson, Daniel)
May 20, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America on 4/24/2020, filed by Plaintiff Jennifer B Nguyen. (Williams-Derry, Amy)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Stephen E Goldman for Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Wystan M. Ackerman for Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
May 18, 2020 Filing 9 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Stephen E. Goldman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6343842 (Bentson, Daniel)
May 18, 2020 Filing 8 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Wystan M. Ackerman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6343814 (Bentson, Daniel)
May 18, 2020 Attorney Owen R Mooney added as counsel for Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America per #5 Notice of Appearance. (PM)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending until 5/29/2020 the deadline for Defendant to answer or respond to the Complaint per parties' #6 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
May 15, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Response Deadline by parties re #1 Complaint (Bentson, Daniel)
May 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Daniel Rahn Bentson on behalf of Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Bentson, Daniel)
May 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Nathan L Nanfelt on behalf of Plaintiff Jennifer B Nguyen. (Nanfelt, Nathan)
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America (CDA)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (CDA) Modified on 4/22/2020 ad hoc Attorney Chase (CDA).
April 22, 2020 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (CDA)
April 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION against defendant(s) Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6285283), filed by JENNIFER B NGUYEN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Birk, Ian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nguyen et al v. Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Wystan M. Ackerman
Represented By: Owen R Mooney
Represented By: Daniel Rahn Bentson
Represented By: Stephen E Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER B NGUYEN
Represented By: Maureen M Falecki
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Irene Margret Hecht
Represented By: Ian S Birk
Represented By: Lynn Lincoln Sarko
Represented By: Amy C Williams-Derry
Represented By: Nathan L Nanfelt
Represented By: Karin Bornstein Swope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jeffrey E Kashner
Represented By: Maureen M Falecki
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Irene Margret Hecht
Represented By: Ian S Birk
Represented By: Lynn Lincoln Sarko
Represented By: Amy C Williams-Derry
Represented By: Nathan L Nanfelt
Represented By: Karin Bornstein Swope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Sunseet S Bath DDS PS individually and on behalf of others similarly situated doing business as Impressions Dentistry Family Cosmetics
Represented By: Maureen M Falecki
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Irene Margret Hecht
Represented By: Ian S Birk
Represented By: Lynn Lincoln Sarko
Represented By: Amy C Williams-Derry
Represented By: Nathan L Nanfelt
Represented By: Karin Bornstein Swope
Represented By: Mark A Wilner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: DDS Khuzi Hsue
Represented By: Maureen M Falecki
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Irene Margret Hecht
Represented By: Ian S Birk
Represented By: Lynn Lincoln Sarko
Represented By: Amy C Williams-Derry
Represented By: Nathan L Nanfelt
Represented By: Karin Bornstein Swope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Ryan M Fox
Represented By: Maureen M Falecki
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Irene Margret Hecht
Represented By: Ian S Birk
Represented By: Lynn Lincoln Sarko
Represented By: Amy C Williams-Derry
Represented By: Karin Bornstein Swope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Stan's Bar-B-Q LLC
Represented By: Maureen M Falecki
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Irene Margret Hecht
Represented By: Ian S Birk
Represented By: Lynn Lincoln Sarko
Represented By: Amy C Williams-Derry
Represented By: Karin Bornstein Swope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Co
Represented By: Wystan M. Ackerman
Represented By: Owen R Mooney
Represented By: Daniel Rahn Bentson
Represented By: Stephen E Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company of America
Represented By: Wystan M. Ackerman
Represented By: Owen R Mooney
Represented By: Daniel Rahn Bentson
Represented By: Stephen E Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?