Lebak v. Ring LLC
Plaintiff: Daniel F Lebak
Defendant: Ring LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00603
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2020 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER re Plaintiff's #10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), this notice is self-executing, and this action is DISMISSED without prejudice and without an award of costs or attorney fees to either party. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
May 19, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff Daniel F Lebak (Corrington, Che)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Shane T Prince for Plaintiff Daniel F Lebak, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Stephen P DeNittis for Plaintiff Daniel F Lebak, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
April 27, 2020 Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Shane T. Prince FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Daniel F Lebak (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6297375 (Hattis, Daniel)
April 27, 2020 Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Stephen P. DeNittis FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Daniel F Lebak (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6297373 (Hattis, Daniel)
April 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Che Z Corrington on behalf of Plaintiff Daniel F Lebak. (Corrington, Che)
April 23, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Ring LLC (SG)
April 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (SG)
April 23, 2020 U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour added. (SG)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Daniel F Lebak (Hattis, Daniel)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Ring LLC with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6286260), filed by Daniel F Lebak. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CLRA Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - CLRA Notice Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hattis, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lebak v. Ring LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ring LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel F Lebak
Represented By: Che Z Corrington
Represented By: Daniel M Hattis
Represented By: Paul Karl Lukacs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?