Wyttmab LLC v. GoDaddy.com LLC
Plaintiff: Wyttmab LLC
Defendant: GoDaddy.com LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00615
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2020 Filing 16 REQUEST by Defendant GoDaddy.com LLC for Judicial Notice re #14 MOTION to Transfer Case , or in the Alternative, Dismiss and Strike (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E)(Seldin, Harper)
June 12, 2020 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Jessica Hanyen filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com LLC re #14 MOTION to Transfer Case , or in the Alternative, Dismiss and Strike (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4H)(Seldin, Harper)
June 12, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Transfer Case , or in the Alternative, Dismiss and Strike, filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com LLC. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/10/2020, (Seldin, Harper)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting the parties' #12 Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. GoDaddy shall respond to the Complaint on or before June 12, 2020. Wyttmab shall file a response to any motion on or before July 2, 2020, and GoDaddy may reply on or before July 10, 2020. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
June 4, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER on Extension of Time and Briefing Schedule by parties re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zecchini, Paula)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 7/7/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 6/23/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/30/2020, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (LW)
May 14, 2020 Attorney Sydney Hitchcock added as counsel for GoDaddy.com LLC per #5 Notice of Appearance. (PM)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Harper Samuel Seldin for Defendant GoDaddy.com LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
May 13, 2020 Filing 9 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Harper S. Seldin FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant GoDaddy.com LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6334709 (Zecchini, Paula)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting parties' #7 Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. GoDaddy shall respond to the Complaint on or before June 4, 2020. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
May 13, 2020 Filing 7 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, , filed by Defendant GoDaddy.com LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/13/2020, (Zecchini, Paula)
May 13, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Go Daddy Operating Company, LLC, Corporate Parent Desert Newco, LLC, Corporate Parent GoDaddy Inc. for GoDaddy.com LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by GoDaddy.com LLC (Zecchini, Paula)
May 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Paula Zecchini on behalf of Defendant GoDaddy.com LLC. (Zecchini, Paula)
May 1, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Wyttmab LLC (Marshall, Toby)
April 27, 2020 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 5/4/2020. (CDA)
April 27, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on GoDaddy, LLC on 4/24/2020, filed by Plaintiff Wyttmab LLC. (Brown, Ari)
April 23, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant GoDaddy.com LLC (CDA)
April 23, 2020 Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (CDA)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Class Action) against defendant(s) GoDaddy.com LLC with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6287490) Attorney Toby James Marshall added to party Wyttmab LLC (pty:pla), filed by Wyttmab LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Marshall, Toby)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wyttmab LLC v. GoDaddy.com LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GoDaddy.com LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wyttmab LLC
Represented By: Toby James Marshall
Represented By: Ari Y Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?