Marler v. Aspen American Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Wade K. Marler, DDS and Wade K Marler
Defendant: Aspen American Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00616
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Aspen American Insurance Company on 6/4/2020, filed by Plaintiff Wade K Marler. (Williams-Derry, Amy)
June 1, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Aspen American Insurance Company with JURY DEMAND, filed by Wade K Marler.(Birk, Ian)
May 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Nathan L Nanfelt on behalf of Plaintiff Wade K Marler. (Nanfelt, Nathan)
May 28, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Aspen American Insurance Company on 5/20/2020, filed by Plaintiff Wade K Marler. (Williams-Derry, Amy)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 7/6/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 6/19/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/6/2020, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD)
April 23, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Aspen American Insurance Company (CDA)
April 23, 2020 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (CDA)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION against defendant(s) Aspen American Insurance Company with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6288047), filed by Wade K. Marler, DDS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Birk, Ian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marler v. Aspen American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wade K. Marler, DDS
Represented By: Maureen M Falecki
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Irene Margret Hecht
Represented By: Ian S Birk
Represented By: Lynn Lincoln Sarko
Represented By: Amy C Williams-Derry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wade K Marler
Represented By: Maureen M Falecki
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Irene Margret Hecht
Represented By: Ian S Birk
Represented By: Lynn Lincoln Sarko
Represented By: Amy C Williams-Derry
Represented By: Nathan L Nanfelt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aspen American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?