Ulbricht et al v. United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company
Plaintiff: Heide L Ulbricht, Karen Ulbricht, Robert S Ulbricht and PM Northwest Inc
Defendant: United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00617
Filed: April 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2020 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Lisa Oestman filed by Defendant United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company re #11 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Dismiss (Brownstein, Nancy)
June 8, 2020 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Nancy A. Brownstein filed by Defendant United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company re #11 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Dismiss (Brownstein, Nancy)
June 8, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Dismiss, filed by Defendant United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/10/2020, (Brownstein, Nancy)
May 21, 2020 Attorneys Steven P Caplow and Everett W Jack, Jr added as counsel for United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company per #10 Notice of Appearance. (PM)
May 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Nancy Anne Brownstein on behalf of Defendant United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company. (Brownstein, Nancy)
May 20, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company for United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company (Brownstein, Nancy)
May 11, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company with JURY DEMAND, filed by Heide L Ulbricht, Karen Ulbricht, PM Northwest Inc, Robert S Ulbricht.(Dykstra, A)
May 1, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James L. Robart as related to 2:20-cv-369-JLR. Magistrate Judge David W. Christel no longer assigned to case, by Clerk, William M McCool. (KEB)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David W. Christel as matter is related to 2:20-cv-00369-DWC. By Traci Whiteley, Deputy Clerk, as authorized by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (TW)
April 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 20-cv-00369, by Plaintiffs PM Northwest Inc, Heide L Ulbricht, Karen Ulbricht, Robert S Ulbricht. (Dykstra, A)
April 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. Notice of Related Case must be filed by 5/4/2020. (ST)
April 24, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by PM Northwest Inc (Dykstra, A)
April 24, 2020 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) PM Northwest Inc must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 5/1/2020. (ST)
April 24, 2020 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company (ST)
April 24, 2020 Judge Theresa L Fricke added. (ST)
April 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6290177) Attorney A Richard Dykstra added to party Heide L. Ulbricht(pty:pla), Attorney A Richard Dykstra added to party Karen Ulbricht(pty:pla), Attorney A Richard Dykstra added to party Robert S. Ulbricht(pty:pla), filed by Heide L. Ulbricht, Karen Ulbricht, Robert S. Ulbricht, and PM Northwest Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Dykstra, A) Modified on 4/27/2020 to add PM Northwest Inc as a filer (KB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ulbricht et al v. United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company
Represented By: Nancy Anne Brownstein
Represented By: Steven P Caplow
Represented By: Everett W Jack, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heide L Ulbricht
Represented By: Justin Olson
Represented By: Alexander E Ackel
Represented By: Matthew Phineas Bergman
Represented By: Kenneth R Friedman
Represented By: Vanessa Firnhaber Oslund
Represented By: A Richard Dykstra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Ulbricht
Represented By: Justin Olson
Represented By: Alexander E Ackel
Represented By: Matthew Phineas Bergman
Represented By: Kenneth R Friedman
Represented By: Vanessa Firnhaber Oslund
Represented By: A Richard Dykstra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert S Ulbricht
Represented By: Justin Olson
Represented By: Alexander E Ackel
Represented By: Matthew Phineas Bergman
Represented By: Kenneth R Friedman
Represented By: Vanessa Firnhaber Oslund
Represented By: A Richard Dykstra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PM Northwest Inc
Represented By: Justin Olson
Represented By: Alexander E Ackel
Represented By: Matthew Phineas Bergman
Represented By: Kenneth R Friedman
Represented By: Vanessa Firnhaber Oslund
Represented By: A Richard Dykstra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?