LINA KIM, DDS, P.S. v. Sentinel Insurance Company Limited
Plaintiff: LINA KIM, DDS, P.S.
Defendant: Sentinel Insurance Company Limited
Case Number: 2:2020cv00657
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #8 Unopposed Motion for Stay of Proceedings. In the event that the JPML denies consolidation, the stay will automatically terminate seven (7) days after the JPML's decision denying consolidation, and Defendant shall have twenty-one (21) additional days from the termination of the stay to answer, move, or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
June 8, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Ruling on JPML Consolidation and Transfer, filed by Plaintiff Lina Kim. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/8/2020, (Williams-Derry, Amy)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting parties' #6 Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. It is ordered that the deadline to extend defendant's time to respond to plaintiff's complaint is extended by 30 days, until June 29, 2020. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
June 2, 2020 Filing 6 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint., filed by Defendant Sentinel Insurance Company Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/2/2020, (Adams, Matthew)
May 29, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Sentinel Insurance Company, Limited on 5/8/2020, filed by Plaintiff Lina Kim. (Williams-Derry, Amy)
May 26, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Sentinel Insurance Company, Limited on 5/8/2020, filed by Plaintiff Lina Kim. (Williams-Derry, Amy)
May 19, 2020 Attorney James Edward Horne for Sentinel Insurance Company Limited added; per #3 Notice of Appearance. (TH)
May 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Matthew S Adams on behalf of Defendant Sentinel Insurance Company Limited. (Adams, Matthew)
May 1, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Sentinel Insurance Company Limited (CDA)
May 1, 2020 Judge James L. Robart added. (CDA)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION against defendant(s) Sentinel Insurance Company Limited with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6305354), filed by LINA KIM, DDS, P.S.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Notice of Related Case)(Birk, Ian) Modified on 5/1/2020 correct text (CDA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LINA KIM, DDS, P.S. v. Sentinel Insurance Company Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINA KIM, DDS, P.S.
Represented By: Maureen M Falecki
Represented By: Nathan L Nanfelt
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Irene Margret Hecht
Represented By: Ian S Birk
Represented By: Lynn Lincoln Sarko
Represented By: Amy C Williams-Derry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentinel Insurance Company Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?