Witte v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Kristen L. Witte
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00659
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES. Length of Trial: 4 days. JURY TRIAL is set for 6/7/2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 13106 before Judge Richard A. Jones. Joinder of Parties due by 9/8/2020, Amended Pleadings due by 12/9/2020, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 12/9/2020, Discovery completed by 2/8/2021, Dispositive motions due by 3/9/2021, Motions in Limine due by 5/10/2021, Pretrial Order due by 5/24/2021, Trial briefs, proposed jury instructions, proposed voir dire, agreed neutral statement of the case, deposition designations, and trial exhibits are to be submitted by 6/1/2021, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
May 18, 2020 Filing 10 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 4. Filed by Plaintiff Kristen L Witte.(Von Beck, David)
May 14, 2020 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT Certification of Attorney by Defendant State Farm Fire & Casualty Company (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rogers, Michael)
May 14, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to State Farm Fire & Casualty Company c/o Office of the Insurance Commissioner on 5/2/2020, filed by Plaintiff Kristen L Witte. (Von Beck, David)
May 12, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal)- re: #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rogers, Michael)
May 1, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (CDA)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 5/15/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/22/2020, Joint Status Report due by 5/29/2020, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
May 1, 2020 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
May 1, 2020 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (CDA)
May 1, 2020 Filing 3 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant State Farm Fire & Casualty Company (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rogers, Michael)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rogers, Michael)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 20-2-07359-8; (Receipt # AWAWDC-6305639), filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Certificate of Service)(Rogers, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/1/2020: #4 First Amended Complaint) (CDA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Witte v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen L. Witte
Represented By: Katie J Comstock
Represented By: Christian J Lawler
Represented By: David M Von Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: Michael Simpson Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?