Baker v. Shin Family LLC
Plaintiff: Brian Baker
Defendant: Shin Family LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00682
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff Brian Baker (Sulzberg, Jill)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 7/21/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 7/7/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/14/2020, by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (LW)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (LW)
May 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jason J Hoeft on behalf of Defendant Shin Family LLC. (Hoeft, Jason)
May 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jill Sulzberg on behalf of Plaintiff Brian Baker. (Sulzberg, Jill)
May 14, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #3 Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint: corrected service date from 5/11/2020 to 5/9/2020. (PM)
May 13, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Shin Family, LLC on 5/11/2020 5/9/2020, filed by Plaintiff Brian Baker. (Terasaki, Michael) Modified on 5/14/2020 to correct service date (PM).
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Shin Family LLC (SG)
May 7, 2020 Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (SG)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Shin Family LLC with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6316741), filed by Brian Baker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Reynoldson, Conrad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Shin Family LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Baker
Represented By: Bonnie Nobuko Fong
Represented By: Conrad Reynoldson
Represented By: Bonnie Fong
Represented By: Jill Sulzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shin Family LLC
Represented By: Jason J Hoeft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?