Amazon.com, Inc. v. Robojap Technologies LLC et al
Plaintiff: Amazon.com, Inc. and Amazon.com Inc
Defendant: Anuj Sharma, Quatic Software Solutions Pvt. Ltd, Robojap Technologies, LLC, Hitesh Kumar Sachdeva, Sukhmeet Singh Bains, Sandeep Singh, Gureen Pawar, Robojap Technologies LLC and Quatic Software Solutions Pvt Ltd
Case Number: 2:2020cv00694
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Sandeep Singh on 6/12/2020, filed by Plaintiff Amazon.com Inc. (MacNaughton, Bonnie)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Robojap Technologies LLC on 6/12/2020, filed by Plaintiff Amazon.com Inc. (MacNaughton, Bonnie)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Robojap Technologies LLC, Sandeep Singh (Attachments: #1 Summons - Sandeep Singh)(PM)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, Summons to Robojap Technologies by Plaintiff Amazon.com Inc (Attachments: #1 Summons to Sandeep Singh)(Cunningham, Tim)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Quatic Software Solutions Pvt Ltd, Hitesh Kumar Sachdeva, Anuj Sharma (Attachments: #1 Summons - Anuj Sharma, #2 Summons - Hitesh Kumar Sachdeva)(PM)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, Summons Anuj Sharma by Plaintiff Amazon.com Inc (Attachments: #1 Summons Quatic Software Solutions PVT. LTD., #2 Summons Hitesh Kumar Sachdeva)(Cunningham, Tim)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Amazon.com Inc (MacNaughton, Bonnie)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (CDA)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Judge James L. Robart added. (CDA)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 5/14/2020. (CDA)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # AWAWDC-6318745) Attorney Bonnie Elizabeth MacNaughton added to party Amazon.com, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120))(MacNaughton, Bonnie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amazon.com, Inc. v. Robojap Technologies LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anuj Sharma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quatic Software Solutions Pvt. Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robojap Technologies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitesh Kumar Sachdeva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sukhmeet Singh Bains
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandeep Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gureen Pawar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robojap Technologies LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quatic Software Solutions Pvt Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By: Tim Cunningham
Represented By: Bonnie Elizabeth MacNaughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amazon.com Inc
Represented By: Tim Cunningham
Represented By: Bonnie Elizabeth MacNaughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?