Iceberg v. Office of Administrative Hearings et al
Plaintiff: Scott Francis Iceberg
Defendant: Office of Administrative Hearings and Johnette Sullivan
Case Number: 2:2020cv00742
Filed: May 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Length of Trial: *5 days*. Jury Trial is set for 10/18/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joinder of Parties due by 8/11/2020, Amended Pleadings due by 8/11/2020, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 4/21/2021, Motions due by 5/21/2021, Discovery completed by 6/21/2021, Dispositive motions due by 7/20/2021, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 9/3/2021, Motions in Limine due by 9/20/2021, Pretrial Order due by 10/6/2021, Trial briefs to be submitted by 10/13/2021, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 10/13/2021. (LC) Modified on 7/14/2020: Copy of order sent to pro se plaintiff via regular mail (LC).
July 9, 2020 Filing 7 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: Five. Filed by Defendants Office of Administrative Hearings, Johnette Sullivan.(Paden, Amy)
July 8, 2020 Reset Deadlines: Pursuant to the joint request of counsel, the Court finds good cause to continue the following deadline: Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/25/2020. (LC)
July 1, 2020 Clerk's Note: per direction from chambers, Dkt. #6 was resent on 7/1/2020 to Plaintiff via USPS at the following address: 12730 126th Way NE Apt F11, Kirkland, WA 98034. (PM)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez: Joint Status Report due by 7/15/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 7/1/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/8/2020. [Copy to pro se plaintiff via first class mail on 6/11/2020.] (LC) Modified on 6/3/2020 (MW).
May 28, 2020 Filing 6 Mail addressed to Scott Francis Iceberg returned as Undeliverable re #2 IFP Deficiency Letter. (PM)
May 27, 2020 Attorney Michael John Nelson II added as counsel for Office of Administrative Hearings and Johnette Sullivan per #4 Notice of Appearance. (PM)
May 26, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Amy Paden on behalf of Defendants Office of Administrative Hearings, Johnette Sullivan. (Paden, Amy)
May 18, 2020 Filing 2 LETTER sent re IFP deficiency; - The APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS is blank or incomplete. Please answer all the questions on the enclosed application and return it to the Court as soon as possible.- The Complaint form was not signed. Please find enclosed the Complaint form to be signed and returned to the Court.- The IFP form is missing part of the 2nd page. The complaint was not signed. Please fill out a complete IFP form and also sign the complaint. Both forms are enclosed with this letter. Filer has until 6/17/2020 to correct (CDA)cc plaintiff via US Mail
May 16, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff Scott Francis Iceberg. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Email transmittal)(CDA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iceberg v. Office of Administrative Hearings et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Administrative Hearings
Represented By: Amy Paden
Represented By: Michael John Nelson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnette Sullivan
Represented By: Amy Paden
Represented By: Michael John Nelson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Francis Iceberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?