Kara McCulloch DMD MSD PLLC v. Valley Forge Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00809
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting Defendants' 63 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Questions to the Washington State Supreme Court. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify by March 25, 2021. Plaintiffs shall have fourteen (14) days from the day Defendants' Responses are filed to file their Replies. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (LH)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' 53 stipulation, and finding that good cause exists for the requested relief from LCR 7(e)(3), the Court hereby GRANTS the stipulation. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs may file a single omnibus opposition brief limited to 95 pages in response to Defendants' Rule 12 Motions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (MW)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 47 Stipulation Regarding Motion for Class Certification: The Court will, if necessary, issue a case schedule setting deadlines for fact and expert discovery and for Plaintiffs (in the class action cases) to file their motions for class certification in the above-referenced actions after the Court rules on the dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (MW)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 SCHEDULING ORDER: The attorneys in this case shall consult with the attorneys in the other business insurance cases so as to prepare a briefing schedule to address common questions of coverage and exclusions and the filing of amended complaints, if required. In determining such a schedule, the attorneys shall ensure that briefing on any future dispositive motions is ripe for Court review at the same time and shall seek to avoid duplication wherever possible. All discovery in this case is stayed until such time as the Court rules on the motions. The Parties shall inform the Court as to their proposed schedule no later than Monday, November 23, 2020. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (MW)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ENTRY: Please be advised that a new case has been added to the list of related cases to be discussed during the November 9 case management conference. See Seattle Bakery LLC et al v. Sentinel Insurance Company Ltd, 20-cv-1540-BJR. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (MW)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE ENTRY: Please be advised that a new case has been added to the list of related cases to be discussed during the November 9 case management conference. See Worthy Hotels Inc et al v. Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, 20-cv-01515-BJR. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (MW)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER: Please be advised that an additional case has been added to the list of related COVID-19 Business Insurance cases assigned to the undersigned. See Seattle Gymnastics Academy Inc. v. Sentinel Insurance Company Ltd. (20-cv-00884). Please see the attached updated list of all relevant cases. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (TH)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting Parties' 21 Stipulated Motion to Stay Deadline for Response to Complaint. The deadline for Defendant to respond to the Complaint is vacated and stayed pending a ruling on Plaintiff's forthcoming motion to consolidate under Fed. R. Civ. P. 42 and LCR 42. Upon resolving Plaintiff's Rule 42 motion, the Court will schedule a status conference to set case deadlines and discuss administration of this matter. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (TH)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 8 Unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Ruling on JPML Consolidation and Transfer. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (TH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kara McCulloch DMD MSD PLLC v. Valley Forge Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?