Westermayer v. Fannie Mae et al
Plaintiff: Ralf Sandro Westermayer
Defendant: Flagstar Bank FSB, Federal National Mortgage Association, Flagstar Bank and Fannie Mae
Case Number: 2:2020cv00839
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER re #9 Notice of Dismissal. Because it is unclear from Plaintiff's filing whether he seeks to dismiss this matter in this Court, the Court ORDERS Plaintiff to show cause whether he seeks dismissal by filing a notice within 14 days of the date of this Order. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM) cc: Plaintiff via USPS on 7/21/2020
July 11, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION/NOTICE to Dismiss, filed by Plaintiff Ralf Sandro Westermayer. Noted by clerk for 8/7/2020. (LH)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 8/13/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 7/30/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/6/2020. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. cc: Plaintiff via USPS (LW)
June 4, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (RE)
June 4, 2020 Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (RE)
June 4, 2020 Filing 6 PRAECIPE to attach document Corrected Signature Page re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants Fannie Mae, US Treasury, Flagstar Bank (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Moore, Ryan)
June 4, 2020 NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The #1 Notice of Removal, was improperly signed by Robert W. Norman, Jr. As such, one or more attorneys were not added to the case and will not receive future notices until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. Please file corrected signature page using Praecipe to Attach event and link to original filing. (RE)
June 2, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Flagstar Bancorp, Inc., Other Affiliate MP Thrift Investments L.P. for Flagstar Bank FSB. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Flagstar Bank FSB (Moore, Ryan)
June 2, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Federal Housing Finance Agency for Federal National Mortgage Association. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Federal National Mortgage Association (Moore, Ryan)
June 2, 2020 Filing 3 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants Federal National Mortgage Association, Flagstar Bank FSB (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Moore, Ryan)
June 2, 2020 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Ryan S. Moore re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants Federal National Mortgage Association, Flagstar Bank FSB (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2)(Moore, Ryan)
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 20-2-08100-1 SEA; (Receipt # AWAWDC-6376530) Attorney Ryan S. Moore added to party Federal National Mortgage Association(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan S. Moore added to party Flagstar Bank FSB(pty:dft), filed by Flagstar Bank FSB, Federal National Mortgage Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moore, Ryan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/4/2020: #2 Complaint) (RE).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westermayer v. Fannie Mae et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flagstar Bank FSB
Represented By: Ryan S. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Ryan S. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flagstar Bank
Represented By: Ryan S. Moore
Represented By: Robert W Norman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fannie Mae
Represented By: Ryan S. Moore
Represented By: Robert W Norman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralf Sandro Westermayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?