White et al v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: John White and Shelli Park
Defendant: Liberty Insurance Corporation and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00841
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Filing 8 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 4-7. (Williams, Thomas)
July 23, 2020 Attorney John Michael Silk for Liberty Insurance Corporation and for Liberty Mutual Insurance Company added per #7 Notice of Appearance. (LH)
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sarah L Eversole on behalf of Defendants Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Eversole, Sarah)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 8/13/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 7/30/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/6/2020. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (LW)
June 29, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to Liberty Mutual Insurance Company on 6/10/2020, filed by Plaintiffs Shelli Park, John White. (Hayes, Todd)
June 29, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to Liberty Insurance Corporation on 6/10/2020, filed by Plaintiffs Shelli Park, John White. (Hayes, Todd)
June 9, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of summons/complaint upon Defendants; documents deposited with Federal Express on 6/9/2020 by Plaintiffs Shelli Park, John White (Hayes, Todd) Modified on 6/10/2020 to include party, method and date of service (PM).
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SG)
June 4, 2020 Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (SG)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief and Damages against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6378113), filed by John White, Shelli Park. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Hayes, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White et al v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John White
Represented By: Todd Christopher Hayes
Represented By: Thomas M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelli Park
Represented By: Todd Christopher Hayes
Represented By: Thomas M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Insurance Corporation
Represented By: John Michael Silk
Represented By: Sarah L Eversole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: John Michael Silk
Represented By: Sarah L Eversole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?