Carruthers et al v. i1 Sensortech Inc
Plaintiff: Brian Carruthers, Paul D Wember, Brent W Nelson and Bryan Carruthers
Defendant: i1 Sensortech Inc, i1 Sensortech Inc doing business as ATHLETE INTELLIGENCE and i1 Sensortech Inc a Washington profit corporation doing business as Athlete Intelligence
Case Number: 2:2020cv00842
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiffs Bryan Carruthers, Brent W Nelson, Paul D Wember re #13 Order Dismissing Case, #12 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (case) (Fain, Steffanie)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF DISMISSAL, signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. Pursuant to Plaintiffs' #12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case, it is ordered that all of Plaintiffs Bryan Carruthers, Brent W. Nelson and Paul D. Wember's claims against Defendant i1 Sensortech, Inc. are dismissed without prejudice. (VE)
June 11, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiffs Bryan Carruthers, Brent W Nelson, Paul D Wember (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fain, Steffanie)
June 10, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiffs Bryan Carruthers, Brent W Nelson, Paul D Wember re #9 RAJ-Standing Order (Fain, Steffanie)
June 10, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiffs Bryan Carruthers, Brent W Nelson, Paul D Wember re #6 Praecipe-Other Summons Complaint & Civil Cover Sheet (Fain, Steffanie)
June 4, 2020 Filing 9 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
June 4, 2020 Filing 8 CORRECTED Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) i1 Sensortech Inc (SG)
June 4, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) i1 Sensortech Inc (SG) Modified on 6/4/2020 corrected summons without header issued(SG).
June 4, 2020 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (SG)
June 4, 2020 Filing 6 PRAECIPE re #1 Complaint, to Correct Caption by Plaintiffs Brian Carruthers, Brent W Nelson, Paul D Wember (Attachments: #1 Complaint Corrected, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Corrected, #3 Summons Corrected)(Fain, Steffanie)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #2 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Ivan L London for Plaintiffs Brian Carruthers, Brent W Nelson, and Paul D Wember, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
June 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Susan K Kaplan. Filed by Plaintiffs Brian Carruthers, Brent W Nelson, Paul D Wember. (Kaplan, Susan)
June 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Steffanie Moxon Fain. Filed by Plaintiffs Brian Carruthers, Brent W Nelson, Paul D Wember. (Fain, Steffanie)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Ivan L. London FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Brian Carruthers, Brent W Nelson, Paul D Wember (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6378233 (Fain, Steffanie)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # AWAWDC-6378146), filed by Brent W Nelson, Brian Carruthers, Paul D Wember. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons)(Fain, Steffanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carruthers et al v. i1 Sensortech Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Carruthers
Represented By: Steffanie Moxon Fain
Represented By: Susan K Kaplan
Represented By: Ivan L London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul D Wember
Represented By: Steffanie Moxon Fain
Represented By: Susan K Kaplan
Represented By: Ivan L London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent W Nelson
Represented By: Steffanie Moxon Fain
Represented By: Susan K Kaplan
Represented By: Ivan L London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Carruthers
Represented By: Steffanie Moxon Fain
Represented By: Susan K Kaplan
Represented By: Ivan L London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: i1 Sensortech Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: i1 Sensortech Inc doing business as ATHLETE INTELLIGENCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: i1 Sensortech Inc a Washington profit corporation doing business as Athlete Intelligence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?