Carlson v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Lindsay Carlson
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00847
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 8/13/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 7/30/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/6/2020. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (LW)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (LW)
June 29, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Douglas F Foley on behalf of Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Foley, Douglas)
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (RE)
June 4, 2020 Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (RE)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Clinton Lee Tapper. Filed by Plaintiff Lindsay Carlson. (Tapper, Clinton)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) State Farm Fire and Casualty Company with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6378688), filed by Lindsay Carlson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons proposed)(Tapper, Clinton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carlson v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsay Carlson
Represented By: Clinton Lee Tapper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Douglas F Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?