Noskenda Inc v. Valley Forge Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Noskenda Inc
Defendant: Valley Forge Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00854
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re #13 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Hallie S Goldblatt for Defendant Valley Forge Insurance Company, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re #12 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Daniel H Levi for Defendant Valley Forge Insurance Company, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Elizabeth M Sacksteder for Defendant Valley Forge Insurance Company, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney H Christopher Boehning for Defendant Valley Forge Insurance Company, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
July 10, 2020 Filing 13 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Hallie S. Goldblatt FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Valley Forge Insurance Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6455806 (Todaro, Anthony)
July 10, 2020 Filing 12 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Daniel H. Levi FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Valley Forge Insurance Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6455790 (Todaro, Anthony)
July 10, 2020 Filing 11 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Elizabeth M. Sacksteder FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Valley Forge Insurance Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6455779 (Todaro, Anthony)
July 10, 2020 Filing 10 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY H. Christopher Boehning FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Valley Forge Insurance Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6455762 (Todaro, Anthony)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #8 Unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Ruling on JPML Consolidation and Transfer. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (TH)
June 30, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Ruling on JPML Consolidation and Transfer, filed by Plaintiff Noskenda Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Williams-Derry, Amy)
June 30, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania, Other Affiliate Loews Corporation, Other Affiliate CNA Financial Corporation, Other Affiliate Continental Casualty Company (CNA), Other Affiliate The Continental Corporation for Valley Forge Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Valley Forge Insurance Company (Todaro, Anthony)
June 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Anthony Todaro on behalf of Defendant Valley Forge Insurance Company. (Todaro, Anthony)
June 17, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Valley Forge Insurance Company on 6/9/2020, filed by Plaintiff Noskenda Inc. (Williams-Derry, Amy)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Barbara J. Rothstein for all further proceedings as related to C20-809BJR. All further pleadings should reflect case number C20-854BJR. Judge Marsha J. Pechman no longer assigned to case. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (LW)
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Noskenda Inc (Birk, Ian)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Valley Forge Insurance Company. (RE)
June 5, 2020 Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (RE)
June 5, 2020 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) Noskenda Inc must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 6/12/2020. (RE)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Valley Forge Insurance Company with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6381003), filed by Noskenda Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Birk, Ian) (Attachment 1 was replaced on 6/5/2020 due to numerous copies of the same civil cover sheet being filed) (RE).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noskenda Inc v. Valley Forge Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley Forge Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel H Levi
Represented By: H Christopher Boehning
Represented By: Anthony Todaro
Represented By: Hallie S Goldblatt
Represented By: Elizabeth M Sacksteder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noskenda Inc
Represented By: Maureen M Falecki
Represented By: Nathan L Nanfelt
Represented By: Mark A Wilner
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Irene Margret Hecht
Represented By: Ian S Birk
Represented By: Lynn Lincoln Sarko
Represented By: Amy C Williams-Derry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?