Fruci & Associates PS v. A10 Capital LLC et al
Plaintiff: Fruci & Associates PS
Defendant: Wheatland Bank Inc, U S Bank NA, KeyBank NA, First Interstate Bancsystem, Mountain West Bank, Sound Community Bank, Numerica Credit Union, Washington Trust Bank, Wells Fargo Bank NA, State Bank Northwest, A10 Capital LLC and First Interstate Bank
Case Number: 2:2020cv00864
Filed: June 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Filing 53 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank NA. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA (Hernandez, Roman)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER re #23 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Tracy K Stratford for KeyBank NA, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER re #48 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Michael Peter Conway for KeyBank NA, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
July 29, 2020 Unable to process Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #23 . E-mailed instructions, PHV Attorney Tracy K Stratford needs to login to PACER and request E-filing with WAWD Court. (DS)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER re #49 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Michael Stephan Kraut for Defendant U S Bank NA, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
July 28, 2020 Filing 49 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Michael S. Kraut FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant U S Bank NA (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6493737 (Larsen-Bright, Shawn)
July 28, 2020 Filing 48 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Michael P. Conway FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant KeyBank NA (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6493532 (Miller, Steven)
July 27, 2020 Filing 47 REQUEST by Plaintiff Fruci & Associates PS for Judicial Notice Of Documents Cited in Response to MTD re #46 Response to Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Ni, Angus)
July 27, 2020 Filing 46 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Fruci & Associates PS, to #14 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6). (Attachments: #1 Appendix A to Response)(Ni, Angus)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER re #37 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Dale R Cockrell for Defendant Mountain West Bank, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting the Parties' #43 Stipulated Motion. The deadline for Defendant KeyBank National Association to answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint is extended to September 4, 2020. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez.(LH)
July 21, 2020 Filing 43 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Time for Defendant KeyBank, N.A. to Respond to Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant KeyBank NA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Miller, Steven)
July 21, 2020 EMailed instructions to PHV Applicant Tracy Startford #23 , to register for EFiling via PACER.gov (DS)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting parties' #39 Stipulated Motion. Based on the stipulation of the parties, it is HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline for Defendant Mountain West Bank to answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint is extended to September 4, 2020. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
July 21, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Tanya O'Neil on behalf of Defendant First Interstate Bank. (O'Neil, Tanya)
July 20, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kellen Andrew Hade on behalf of Defendant Mountain West Bank. (Hade, Kellen)
July 20, 2020 Filing 39 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Time for Defendant Mountain West Bank to Respond to Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant Mountain West Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Miller, Steven)
July 20, 2020 Filing 38 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Glacier Bancorp Inc., Other Affiliate BlackRock Inc. for Mountain West Bank. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Mountain West Bank (Miller, Steven)
July 20, 2020 Filing 37 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Dale R. Cockrell FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Mountain West Bank (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6475667 (Miller, Steven)
July 20, 2020 Filing 36 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Mountain West Bank (Miller, Steven)
July 20, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Steven A Miller on behalf of Defendant Mountain West Bank. (Miller, Steven)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting the Parties' #33 Stipulated Motion. Washington Trust Bank and Sound Community Bank's #14 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6) is re-noted for 8/7/2020. Opposition due 7/27/2020; Reply due 8/7/2020. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez.(LH)
July 15, 2020 Filing 33 Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Briefing Schedule and Noting Date for Defendants Washington Trust Bank and Sound Community Bank's Motion to Dismiss, filed by Defendants Sound Community Bank, Washington Trust Bank. Noting Date 7/15/2020, (Burnside, Fred)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting the Parties' #26 Stipulated Motion to Extend Time for Defendants A10 Capital, LLC, U.S. Bank, and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., to Respond to Amended Complaint. Deadline extended until 30 days after the Judicial Panel for Multidistrict Litigation ("JPML") rules on the Motion to Transfer in MDL Case No. 2950 which is currently pending before the JPML. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez.(LH)
July 14, 2020 Attorney Thomas N Abbott for A10 Capital LLC added per #31 Notice of Appearance. (LH)
July 14, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kristine E Kruger on behalf of Defendant A10 Capital LLC. (Kruger, Kristine)
July 14, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Roman D. Hernandez on behalf of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Hernandez, Roman)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting the Parties' #28 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for defendant First Interstate Bank to answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint is extended to August 27, 2020. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez.(LH)
July 14, 2020 NOTE re: #26 Joint Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Amended Complaint. The appearances of attorneys Kristine E. Kruger, Thomas N. Abbott and Romn D. Hernndez are not proper, and notices of electronic filing will not be sent until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. Please file Notice of Appearances to correct this deficiency. (PM)
July 14, 2020 NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The #27 Notice of Appearance was improperly signed by Tanya O'Neil. As such, Ms.O'Neil will not be added to the case and will not receive future notices until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. Please file corrected signature page using Praecipe to Attach event and link to original filing or a Notice of Appearance with correct electronic signature may be filed. (LH)
July 13, 2020 Filing 28 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , filed by Defendant First Interstate Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/13/2020, (Hawk, Christopher)
July 13, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christopher E. Hawk on behalf of Defendant First Interstate Bank. (Hawk, Christopher)
July 13, 2020 Filing 26 Joint Stipulated MOTION to Extend Tiime to Respond to Amended Complaint, filed by Defendants A10 Capital LLC, U S Bank NA, Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/13/2020, (Hernandez, Roman)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re #24 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Christopher M McLaughlin for KeyBank NA, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
July 10, 2020 Filing 24 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Christopher M. McLaughlin FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant KeyBank NA (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6455201 (Miller, Steven)
July 10, 2020 Filing 23 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Tracy K. Stratford FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant KeyBank NA (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6455196 (Miller, Steven)
July 10, 2020 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by KeyBank NA (Miller, Steven)
July 10, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Steven A Miller on behalf of Defendant KeyBank NA. (Miller, Steven)
July 9, 2020 Reset Deadlines: Per joint request of counsel, the Court finds good cause to continue the initial case deadlines as follows: FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 8/5/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/12/2020, Joint Status Report due by 8/19/2020. (LC)
July 7, 2020 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp for U S Bank NA. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by U S Bank NA (Larsen-Bright, Shawn)
July 7, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Shawn J Larsen-Bright on behalf of Defendant U S Bank NA. (Larsen-Bright, Shawn)
July 2, 2020 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent W.T.B. Financial Corporation for Washington Trust Bank. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Washington Trust Bank (Burnside, Fred)
July 2, 2020 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Sound Financial Bancorp, Inc for Sound Community Bank. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Sound Community Bank (Burnside, Fred)
July 2, 2020 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Defendants Sound Community Bank, Washington Trust Bank for Judicial Notice re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Burnside, Fred)
July 2, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6), filed by Defendants Sound Community Bank, Washington Trust Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/24/2020, (Burnside, Fred)
July 2, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Fred B Burnside on behalf of Defendants Sound Community Bank, Washington Trust Bank. (Burnside, Fred)
June 23, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #12 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Party(s) : edited text to add Wheatland Bank, Inc. as party dismissed with prejudice (PM)
June 22, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of MDL Filing In re: Paycheck Protection Program (PPP) Agent Fees. Bank of America Corporation's and Bank of America, N.A.'s Response to Alliant CPA Group LLC's Motion for Transfer of Actions for Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings. (PM)
June 22, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Wheatland Bank, Inc. with prejudice filed by Plaintiff Fruci & Associates PS. (Ni, Angus) Modified on 6/23/2020 to add name of party dismissed (PM).
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 7/29/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 7/15/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/22/2020. (LC)
June 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Wheatland Bank Inc, filed by Plaintiff Fruci & Associates PS. (Ni, Angus)
June 15, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filings before MDL Panel In re: Paycheck Protection Program ("PPP) Agent Fees Litigation. (PM)
June 11, 2020 Filing 8 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant First Interstate Bank - Corporation Service Company (Registered Agent) (PM)
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to First Interstate Bank by Plaintiff Fruci & Associates PS (Ni, Angus)
June 10, 2020 Party First Interstate Bank added. Party First Interstate Bancsystem terminated per #5 Amended Complaint. (PM)
June 9, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Fruci & Associates PS (Ni, Angus)
June 9, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by Fruci & Associates PS.(Ni, Angus)
June 9, 2020 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 6/16/2020. (MET)
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(CDA)
June 8, 2020 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (CDA)
June 8, 2020 Filing 3 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Fruci & Associates, PS (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(Ni, Angus)
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint ; filed by Plaintiff Fruci & Associates, PS. (Ni, Angus)
June 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6385108) Attorney Angus Ni added to party Fruci & Associates, PS(pty:pla), filed by Fruci & Associates, PS.(Ni, Angus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fruci & Associates PS v. A10 Capital LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fruci & Associates PS
Represented By: Angus Ni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wheatland Bank Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Bank NA
Represented By: Shawn J Larsen-Bright
Represented By: Michael Stephan Kraut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KeyBank NA
Represented By: Christopher M McLaughlin
Represented By: Michael Peter Conway
Represented By: Tracy K Stratford
Represented By: Steven A Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Interstate Bancsystem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountain West Bank
Represented By: Kellen Andrew Hade
Represented By: Dale R Cockrell
Represented By: Steven A Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sound Community Bank
Represented By: Fred B Burnside
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Numerica Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Trust Bank
Represented By: Fred B Burnside
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Represented By: Roman D. Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Bank Northwest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A10 Capital LLC
Represented By: Thomas N Abbott
Represented By: Kristine E Kruger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Interstate Bank
Represented By: Tanya O'Neil
Represented By: Christopher E. Hawk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?