Wilmington Trust NA v. Prier Marks et al
Plaintiff: Wilmington Trust, N.A.
Defendant: Myeisha Myles Montealegre, Richard Marks, Catherine Prier Marks and Lanae Myles
Case Number: 2:2020cv00903
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2020 Filing 9 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Richard Marks, Myeisha Myles Montealegre, Catherine Prier Marks (MW)
July 2, 2020 Filing 8 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Wilmington Trust NA (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Rankin, Daniel)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: The Honorable Thomas S. Zilly transfers the above captioned case as related to C19-1336 RSL to the Honorable Robert S. Lasnik. All future pleadings shall bear the cause number C20-903 RSL. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW)
June 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:19-cv-01336-RSL, by Plaintiff Wilmington Trust NA. (Rankin, Daniel)
June 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER: Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. Notice of Related Case must be filed by 6/22/2020. (RE)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Ira S Lipsius for Plaintiff Wilmington Trust NA, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
June 15, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Ira S. Lipsius FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Wilmington Trust NA (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6401216 (Rankin, Daniel) E-Mail for PHV applicant is iral@lipsiuslaw.com 6/15/2020 (DS).
June 15, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Wilmington Trust Corporation for Wilmington Trust NA. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Wilmington Trust NA (Rankin, Daniel)
June 12, 2020 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (RE)
June 12, 2020 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) Wilmington Trust NA must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 6/19/2020. (RE)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Richard Marks, Myeisha Myles Montealegre, Catherine Prier Marks with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6395660), filed by Wilmington Trust, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rankin, Daniel) Modified on 6/12/2020 to edit additional document title. (RE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilmington Trust NA v. Prier Marks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myeisha Myles Montealegre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Prier Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lanae Myles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmington Trust, N.A.
Represented By: Daniel W. Rankin
Represented By: Eric Peter Gillett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?